Huawei Technologies USA, Inc. et al v. United States of America, et al
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Amos L Mazzant, III |
Case #: | 4:19-cv-00159 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s) |
Case Filed: | Mar 06, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 01, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2019 4:36 AM CDT |
Defendant
Alexander Acosta
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alex Azar, II
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David L. Bernhardt
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Betsy DeVos
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Emily Webster Murphy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sonny Perdue
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert Wilkie
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Huawei Technologies USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
1. | Court rejects Huawei's lawsuit over federal defense spending law (politico.com) |
Submitted Fri 02/21/2020 | |
2. | U.S. asks federal court to throw out Huawei lawsuit (reuters.com) |
Submitted Mon 07/08/2019 | |
3. | Huawei Revs Up Its U.S. Lawsuit, With the Media in Mind (nytimes.com) |
Submitted Wed 05/29/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 81 minutes ago |
Friday, May 01, 2020 | ||
53 | 53
1
pgs
order
Judgment
Fri 05/01 3:15 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT. Pursuant to the Memorandum Opinion and Order entered in this case on February 18, 2020 (Dkt.51 ), it is CONSIDERED, ORDERED and ADJUDGED that this case is hereby DISMISSED. All relief not previously granted is hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/1/2020. (baf, ) |