USA v. Barriga-Beltran
New York Eastern District Court | |
Case #: | 2:19-cr-00116 |
Case Filed: | Mar 05, 2019 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 07, 2019 2:56 AM EST |
Defendant
Jummy Jesus Barriga-Beltran (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/07/2019 3:14 AM EST |
Thursday, November 01, 2018 | ||
Arrest of Jimmy Jesus Barriga-Beltran (McMorrow, Karen) [2:18-mj-01047-GRB] | ||
Oral MOTION to Exclude speedy indictment time through 1/4/2019 , Oral MOTION to Remand defendant into US Marshal custody pending disposition of charges by USA as to Jimmy Jesus Barriga-Beltran. (McMorrow, Karen) [2:18-mj-01047-GRB] | ||
Oral MOTION for Medical Treatment while in custody by Jimmy Jesus Barriga-Beltran. (McMorrow, Karen) [2:18-mj-01047-GRB] | ||
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown:Initial Appearance and Arraignment as to Jimmy Jesus Barriga-Beltran (1) Count Complaint held on 11/1/2018; APPEARANCES: Defendant present in custody with Nancy Bartling (CJA), AUSA Bradley King and Ana Cecilia Rosado (Spanish Interpreter) on stand-by (sworn). Defendant informed of rights. Counsel appointed. Government moves to Remand defendant into US Marshal custody pending disposition of charges -argument heard. No bail package presented at this time. Order of detention executed without prejudice to renew. Parties move to Exclude speedy indictment time through 1/4/2019 -argument heard. Order executed. Defendant moves for medical order. Motion granted -medical order executed. Defendant remains in custody.(FTR Log #2:57-3:09.) (McMorrow, Karen) [2:18-mj-01047-GRB] | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT as to Jimmy Jesus Barriga-Beltran. (McMorrow, Karen) [2:18-mj-01047-GRB] | |
2 | 2 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jimmy Jesus Barriga-Beltran (McMorrow, Karen) [2:18-mj-01047-GRB] | |
3 | 3 CJA 20 as to Jimmy Jesus Barriga-Beltran: Appointment of Attorney Nancy Lynn Bartling for Jimmy Jesus Barriga-Beltran.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 11/1/2018. (McMorrow, Karen) [2:18-mj-01047-GRB] | |
4 | 4 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Jimmy Jesus Barriga-Beltran. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 11/1/2018. (McMorrow, Karen) [2:18-mj-01047-GRB] | |
5 | 5 Medical Evaluation Order as to Jimmy Jesus Barriga-Beltran. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 11/1/2018. (McMorrow, Karen) [2:18-mj-01047-GRB] | |
6 | 6 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Jimmy Jesus Barriga-Beltran Time excluded from 11/1/2018 until 1/4/2019.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 11/1/2018. (McMorrow, Karen) [2:18-mj-01047-GRB] | |
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
8 | 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay.Bond Hearing as to Jimmy Jesus Barriga-Beltran held on 1/16/2019. Appearances: Bradley King for the USA, Nancy Bartling (CJA) for Mr. Barriga-Beltran. Order Setting Conditions of Release and Bond entered. Mr. Barriga-Beltran waived his right to a speedy indictment from 1/16/2019 through March 6, 2019. (Imrie, Robert) [2:18-mj-01047-GRB] | |
9 | 9 WAIVER of Speedy indictment by Jimmy Jesus Barriga-Beltran from 1/16/2019 through 3/6/2019. (Imrie, Robert) [2:18-mj-01047-GRB] | |
11 | 11 REDACTION by Jimmy Jesus Barriga-Beltran to 10 Order Setting Conditions of Release. (Imrie, Robert) [2:18-mj-01047-GRB] | |
Tuesday, January 22, 2019 | ||
7 | 7 Letter requesting additional time to file bail documents as to Jimmy Jesus Barriga-Beltran (Conway, Joseph) [2:18-mj-01047-GRB] | |
Tuesday, March 05, 2019 | ||
12 | 12 NOTICE of Intent to proceed under FRCrP 7(b) as to Jummy Jesus Barriga-Beltran (Landow, Concetta) Modified on 3/6/2019 (Landow, Concetta). | |
Att: 1 Criminal Information Sheet |