California Central District Court
Judge:Percy Anderson
Referred: Gail J Standish
Case #: 2:19-cv-01640
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Apr 20, 2019 1:39 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
E B Investments
Defendant
Goodwill Industries of Southern California
Plaintiff
Mal Kim
Represented By
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 50 minutes ago
Friday, March 15, 2019
9 9 10 pgs order Order Mon 1:20 PM
STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
8 8 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Fri 7:30 PM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation Early Mediation Program. (jre)
Related: [-]
7 7 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Fri 4:11 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-01640 PA(GJSx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2019
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 10:38 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 10:37 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (lh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2019
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 2:35 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff MAL KIM, (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 2:34 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff MAL KIM. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Wed 2:34 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff MAL KIM. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 2:33 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23329207 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff MAL KIM. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party MAL KIM(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]