California Central District Court
Judge:Consuelo B Marshall
Referred: Maria A Audero
Case #: 2:19-cv-01646
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Apr 20, 2019 1:51 AM PDT
Defendant
Joseph J. Euteneuer
Defendant
Ynon Kreiz
Defendant
Mattel, Inc.
Plaintiff
Carol Wyatt
Represented By
Lionel Zevi Glancy
Glancy Prongay And Murray LLP
contact info
Robert Vincent Prongay
Glancy Prongay And Murray LLP
contact info
Charles Henry Linehan
Glancy Prongay And Murray LLP
contact info
Lesley F Portnoy
Glancy Prongay And Murray LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 49 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 22, 2019
28 28 2 pgs order Order Fri 1:16 PM
ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall, GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION APPOINTING CAROL WYATT, VICKIE BLAIR, AND JOSEPH STELLA AS LEAD PLAINTIFF, APPROVING THEIR SELECTION OF CO-LEAD COUNSEL,15 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE STIPULATION IS GRANTED: 1) The previously-filed motions (Dkt. Nos. 9 & 11) for appointment as lead plaintiff submitted by Wyatt and Blair, and Stella are granted. 2) Wyatt, Blair, and Stella are jointly appointed to serve as Co-Lead Plaintiffs pursuant to Section 21D(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, 15 U.S.C. Section 78u-4(a)(3)(B), as amended by the PSLRA, in this case. 3) Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP and Gibbs Law Group LLP are appointed Lead Counsel for the proposed class. 4) Lead Counsel and counsel for Defendants are to meet and confer and, within the later of (i) seven days after the entry of an order appointing Co-Lead Plaintiffs and approving the selection of Lead Counsel, or (ii) Defendants counsel entering an appearance in this action, jointly propose a schedule for the filing of Co-Lead Plaintiffs amended complaint and the briefs relating to Defendants anticipated motion to dismiss. (shb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2019
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 3:52 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeffrey B Kosbie counsel for Movant Joseph Stella. Adding Jeffrey B. Kosbie as counsel of record for Joseph Stella for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Movant for Lead Plaintiff Joseph Stella. (Attorney Jeffrey B Kosbie added to party Joseph Stella(pty:mov))(Kosbie, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 3:49 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David K Stein counsel for Movant Joseph Stella. Adding David Stein as counsel of record for Joseph Stella for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Movant for Lead Plaintiff Joseph Stella. (Stein, David)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines Fri 3:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall:NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES OF COURT ORDER. On the Courts own motion, the Motion of Carol Wyatt and Vickie Blair for appointment as lead plaintiff and approval of counsel, filed on May 6, 20199 and the Motion of Joseph Stella for appointment as lead plaintiff and approval of his selection of lead counsel, filed on May 5, 201912 , currently scheduled for June 3, 2019, are hereby ordered continued to June 4, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (lc)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 3:43 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Eric H Gibbs counsel for Movant Joseph Stella. Adding Eric H. Gibbs as counsel of record for Joseph Stella for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Movant for Lead Plaintiff Joseph Stella. (Gibbs, Eric)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 1:48 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2019
22 22 4 pgs stip Order Thu 4:34 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Order Regarding (1) Defendants' Response to Initial Securities Complaint and (2) Schedule for Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Joseph J. Euteneuer, Ynon Kreiz, Mattel, Inc..(Phadke, Achyut)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 15, 2019
21 21 cs_rasgn Reassign Case - Self -Recusal --pursuant GO 19-03 (CV-52) Wed 1:57 PM
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Percy Anderson. Case transferred from Judge Percy Anderson to the calendar of Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-01646 CBM(MAAx). (rn)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Wed 11:44 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance,16 , Notice of Appearance,18 , Notice of Appearance,17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2019
19 19 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 5:55 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Carol Wyatt, Vickie Blair. upon Joseph J. Euteneuer waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; Ynon Kreiz waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Achyut J. Phadke. (Prongay, Robert)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Appearance Tue 4:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Lauren Claire Barnett on behalf of Defendants Joseph J. Euteneuer, Ynon Kreiz, Mattel, Inc. (Attorney Lauren Claire Barnett added to party Joseph J. Euteneuer(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Claire Barnett added to party Ynon Kreiz(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Claire Barnett added to party Mattel, Inc.(pty:dft))(Barnett, Lauren)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Appearance Tue 4:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney John W Spiegel on behalf of Defendants Joseph J. Euteneuer, Ynon Kreiz, Mattel, Inc. (Attorney John W Spiegel added to party Joseph J. Euteneuer(pty:dft), Attorney John W Spiegel added to party Ynon Kreiz(pty:dft), Attorney John W Spiegel added to party Mattel, Inc.(pty:dft))(Spiegel, John)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Appearance Tue 4:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Achyut Jayant Phadke on behalf of Defendants Joseph J. Euteneuer, Ynon Kreiz, Mattel, Inc. (Attorney Achyut Jayant Phadke added to party Joseph J. Euteneuer(pty:dft), Attorney Achyut Jayant Phadke added to party Ynon Kreiz(pty:dft), Attorney Achyut Jayant Phadke added to party Mattel, Inc.(pty:dft))(Phadke, Achyut)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2019
15 15 5 pgs stip Order Mon 5:47 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Order Appointing Carol Wyatt, Vickie Blair, and Joseph Stella as Lead Plaintiff, Approving their Selection of Co-Lead Counsel filed by Plaintiff Vickie Blair, Joseph Stella, Carol Wyatt.(Attorney David K Stein added to party Joseph Stella(pty:mov))(Stein, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
14 14 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 5:27 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Carol Wyatt, upon Defendant Mattel, Inc. served on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon ALBERT DAMONTE, INTAKE SPECIALIST, CT CORPORATION SYSTEM, REGISTERED AGENT in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Prongay, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2019
13 13 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 11:50 PM
Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Movant Joseph Stella, (Attorney Eric H Gibbs added to party Joseph Stella(pty:mov))(Gibbs, Eric)
Related: [-]
12 12 2 pgs motion Order Mon 11:45 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of His Selection of Lead Counsel filed by Movant Joseph Stella. Motion set for hearing on 6/3/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attorney Eric H Gibbs added to party Joseph Stella(pty:bkmov)) (Gibbs, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Joseph Stella's Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of his Selection of Lead Counsel,
Att: 2 Declaration of Eric H. Gibbs in Support of Joseph Stella's Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of his Selection of Lead Counsel,
Att: 3 Exhibit A to Gibbs Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit B to Gibbs Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit C to Gibbs Declaration,
Att: 6 Exhibit D to Gibbs Declaration,
Att: 7 Proposed Order,
Att: 8 Proof of Service
11 11 respm Declaration (Motion related) Mon 6:11 PM
DECLARATION of Lesley F. Portnoy In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff 9 filed by Movant Vickie Blair, Plaintiff Carol Wyatt.(Portnoy, Lesley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Press Release,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Certifications,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume
10 10 11 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 6:09 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff 9 filed by Movant Vickie Blair, Plaintiff Carol Wyatt. (Portnoy, Lesley)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Appointment of Counsel Mon 6:08 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff filed by Movants Carol Wyatt, Vickie Blair. Motion set for hearing on 6/3/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attorney Lesley F Portnoy added to party Vickie Blair(pty:mov)) (Portnoy, Lesley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Sunday, March 10, 2019
8 8 10 pgs order Order Mon 10:02 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2019
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 5:02 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Joseph J. Euteneuer, Ynon Kreiz, Mattel, Inc. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 4:53 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 4:53 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (car)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2019
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 3:52 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Carol Wyatt, (Prongay, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 3:50 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Carol Wyatt. (Prongay, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Wed 3:49 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Carol Wyatt. (Prongay, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 3:47 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23330306 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Carol Wyatt. (Attorney Robert Vincent Prongay added to party Carol Wyatt(pty:pla))(Prongay, Robert)
Related: [-]