California Eastern District Court
Judge:Erica P Grosjean
Case #: 1:19-cv-00299
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2019
Terminated:Mar 07, 2019
Petitioner
Jerome Markiel Davis
Respondent
Carlos Bolanos

GPO Mar 07 2019
ORDER Transferring Case to the Sacramento Division. New Case Number 2:19-cv-00408 CKD (HC). Old Case Number 1:19-cv-00299 EPG (HC), signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/7/2019. (Hellings, J)

Docket last updated: 03/20/2019 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, March 07, 2019
3 3 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Case Transferred Out - Divisional Thu 4:07 PM
ORDER Transferring Case to the Sacramento Division. New Case Number 2:19-cv-00408 CKD (HC). Old Case Number 1:19-cv-00299 EPG (HC), signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/7/2019. (Hellings, J)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Thu 4:07 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:3 Order, Case Transferred Out - Divisional served on Jerome Markiel Davis. (Hellings, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2019
2 2 motion In Forma Pauperis Wed 3:40 PM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jerome Markiel Davis. (Martin-Gill, S)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Wed 3:39 PM
PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Carlos Bolanos by Jerome Markiel Davis.(Martin-Gill, S)
Related: [-]