USA v. Houdyschell
Texas Southern District Court | |
Case #: | 1:19-cr-00190 |
Case Filed: | Mar 05, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 17, 2019 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 08, 2019 2:21 AM CST |
Defendant
Jonathan Paul Houdyschell (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/24/2019 7:50 AM CDT |
Wednesday, February 06, 2019 | ||
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan: INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint held on 2/6/2019 as to Jonathan Paul Houdyschell. Defendant's First Appearance; advised of charges and rights. Defendant examined by Pretrial Services Agency. Defendant WAIVES court appointed counsel. Deft will hire private counsel. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 2/11/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan. Defendant held without bond. Detention Hearing set for 2/11/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan. Deft remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Appearances:Nicole Piquette, AUSA;(USPO:Eddie Deleon)(PSA: Enrique Guerra)(ERO:Dori Noriega)(Interpreter:Sandra Cortez, present not needed)(DUSM: David Gavito) (CSO: Tony Arriaga)(bvasquez, 1)[10:19 - 10:34 AM] [1:19-mj-00208] | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT as to Jonathan Paul Houdyschell (1), filed. (dnoriega, 1) (dbenavides, 1). [1:19-mj-00208] | |
2 | 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Jonathan Paul Houdyschell, arrested on 2/5/2019, filed.(dnoriega, 1) (dbenavides, 1). (dbenavides, 1). [1:19-mj-00208] | |
Att: 1 (2/6/2019) Unredacted attachment | ||
3 | 3 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Jonathan Paul Houdyschell, filed. [1:19-mj-00208] | |
Thursday, February 07, 2019 | ||
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Angel Castro appearing for USA, filed.(Castro, Angel) [1:19-mj-00208] | ||
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ernesto Gamez, Jr appearing for Jonathan Paul Houdyschell , Defendant , filed.(Gamez, Ernesto) [1:19-mj-00208] | |
Monday, February 11, 2019 | ||
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan: PRELIMINARY/DETENTION HEARING as to Jonathan Paul Houdyschell held on 2/11/2019. Preliminary Hearing NOT HELD. Waiver of Preliminary Hearing filed in Court. Court proceeds with Detention Hearing. After review of the PSA report and arguments of counsel, the Court sets a $100,000.00 Bond with $10,000 Deposit and conditions as recited on the record. Deft remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Appearances:Angel Castro, AUSA; Erin Gamez and Ernesto Gamez f/dft.(USPO:Michael Stevens)(PSA: Enrique Guerra)(ERO:Jennifer R Longoria)(Interpreter:Monica Licea Castro - excused)(DUSM: Martin Arellano)(CSO: Tony Arriaga)(bvasquez, 1) [1:19-mj-00208] | ||
Bond payment received for Jonathan Paul Houdyschell re9 Bond. Payment submitted by Adrianne Nicole Hauff in the amount of $10,000.00. Receipt number # BRO007253, filed. (mperez, 1) [1:19-mj-00208] | ||
5 | 5 First MOTION for Release from Custody Pending Trial by Jonathan Paul Houdyschell, filed.(Gamez, Ernesto) [1:19-mj-00208] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
6 | 6 Amended MOTION for Release from Custody by Jonathan Paul Houdyschell, filed.(Gamez, Ernesto) [1:19-mj-00208] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
7 | 7 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Jonathan Paul Houdyschell, filed. (ecmiller, 1) [1:19-mj-00208] | |
8 | 8 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination by Jonathan Paul Houdyschell, filed.(EdnitaPonce, 1) [1:19-mj-00208] | |
Tuesday, February 12, 2019 | ||
9 | 9 Appearance Bond Entered as to Jonathan Paul Houdyschell in amount of $100,000.00 with a $10,000.00 deposit, filed.(EdnitaPonce, 1) [1:19-mj-00208] | |
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment | ||
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
10 | 10 MOTION for Return of Property by Jonathan Paul Houdyschell, filed.(Gamez, Ernesto) [1:19-mj-00208] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order for Release of Property | ||
Wednesday, February 27, 2019 | ||
11 | 11 Certificate of Conference re: Opposed MOTION for Return of Property by Jonathan Paul Houdyschell, filed. (Gamez, Ernesto) Modified on 2/27/2019 (bvasquez, 1)to correct title of document. [1:19-mj-00208] | |
Thursday, February 28, 2019 | ||
12 | 12 ORDER denying10 Motion for Release/Return of Property as to Jonathan Paul Houdyschell (1) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan.) Parties notified. (rnieto, 1) [1:19-mj-00208] | |
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
13 | 13 Second MOTION for Return of Property by Jonathan Paul Houdyschell, filed.(Gamez, Ernesto) [1:19-mj-00208] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 05, 2019 | ||
14 | 14 2 pgs INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Jonathan Paul Houdyschell (1) count(s) 1, filed. (jtabaresadi, 1) (dorinan, 1). | |
Att: 1 (3/7/2019) Unredacted attachment | ||
15 | 15 1 pgs US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Jonathan Paul Houdyschell, filed.(jtabaresadi, 1) |