California Central District Court
Judge:Andrew J Guilford
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 8:19-cv-00448
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2019
Last checked: Friday Mar 08, 2019 12:25 AM PST
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Kammarie Lyn McClain
Defendant
Louise A. McClain
Defendant
William D. McClain
Plaintiff
Nehemiah Kong
Represented By
Phyl Grace
Center For Disability Access
contact info
Chris Carson
Center For Disability Access
contact info
Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Center For Disability Access
contact info
Dennis Jay Price, II
Center For Disability Access
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, April 17, 2019
16 16 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 11:20 AM
[IN CHAMBERS] Text Only Entry: The Court DENIES Defendants' Applications for Stay and Early Mediation11 12 13 . An Early Scheduling Conference is set for May 9, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. The parties may mediate before the Court's mediation panel at any time. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2019
15 15 motion Stay Case and Early Mediation (ADR-21) Mon 11:36 AM
APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendant Louise A. McClain Louise A. McClain. (Jarman, Michael)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Stay Case and Early Mediation (ADR-21) Mon 11:34 AM
APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendant Kammarie Lyn McClain Kammarie Lyn McClain. (Jarman, Michael)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Stay Case and Early Mediation (ADR-21) Mon 11:28 AM
First APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendant William D. McClain Kammarie Lyn McClain, Louise A. McClain, William D. McClain. (Attorney Michael Richard Jarman added to party Kammarie Lyn McClain(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Richard Jarman added to party Louise A. McClain(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Richard Jarman added to party William D. McClain(pty:dft)) (Jarman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2019
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 10:27 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, upon Defendant Louise A. McClain served on 4/6/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon William D. McClain - co-defendant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 10:24 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, upon Defendant Kammarie Lyn McClain served on 4/6/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon William D. McClain, co-defendant. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2019
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 7:13 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, upon Defendant William D. McClain served on 3/25/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2019
9 9 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 10:24 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court hereby continues the Early Scheduling Conference previously set for April 22, 2019 to *Thursday, May 9, 2019 at 9:00 a.m.*THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2019
8 8 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 2:51 PM
MINUTE [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER FOR EARLY SCHEDULINGCONFERENCE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court ORDERS that this hearing take place on April 22, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. *See document for further information. (es)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 10:05 AM
21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint1 as to defendants Kammarie Lyn McClain, Louise A. McClain, William D. McClain. (esa)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 9:58 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 9:58 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (esa)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Thu 1:55 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Carson, Chris)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 1:46 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, (Carson, Chris)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 1:44 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Carson, Chris)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 1:44 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23332155 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Nehemiah Kong(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris)
Related: [-]