California Central District Court
Judge:Josephine L Staton
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 8:19-cv-00452
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause47:0227 Violation of Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2019
Last checked: Friday Mar 08, 2019 12:18 AM PST
Defendant
Lennar Corporation
Plaintiff
Sunil Daniel
Represented By
Mark Samuel Greenstone
Greenstone Law Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/22/2019 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, March 20, 2019
9 9 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 2:41 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sunil Daniel, upon Defendant Lennar Corporation served on 3/13/2019, answer due 4/3/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon The Corporation Trust Company, Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Greenstone, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 10:38 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (rrp)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2019
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 12:37 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Lennar Corporation. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 12:35 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 12:35 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (et)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2019
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sunil Daniel, (Greenstone, Mark)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 10:44 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sunil Daniel. (Greenstone, Mark)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Thu 10:43 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Sunil Daniel. (Greenstone, Mark)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 10:42 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23334042 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Sunil Daniel. (Attorney Mark Samuel Greenstone added to party Sunil Daniel(pty:pla))(Greenstone, Mark)
Related: [-]