California Central District Court
Judge:James V Selna
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 8:19-cv-00454
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Apr 21, 2019 2:17 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By
Jibraun Riaz
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Camilo Echavarria
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael DeGuzman
Represented By
Dayna Christine Carter
Petronelli Law Group PC
contact info
Christian J Petronelli
Petronelli Law Group PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/21/2019 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 17, 2019
14 14 order For Order Wed 12:03 PM
ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR COURT APPROVAL ALLOWING ATTENDANCE OF ATTORNEY JIBRAUN B. RIAZ AT INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE13 by Judge James V. Selna: To accommodate United's lead trial counsel, Camilo Echavarria, the Court continues the Scheduling Conference to 3:00 p.m. April 22, 2019. Lead counsel shall attend. (es)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2019
13 13 misc Miscellaneous Document Tue 4:44 PM
Defendant's Request for Court Approval Allowing Attendance of Attorney Jibraun B. Riaz at Initial Scheduling Conference filed by Defendant United Airlines, Inc.(Echavarria, Camilo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Camilo Echavarria,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 03, 2019
12 12 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Wed 11:45 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 to 8 days, filed by Defendant United Airlines, Inc... (Riaz, Jibraun)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2019
11 11 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Tue 11:55 AM
Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference by Judge James V. Selna. Scheduling Conference set for 4/22/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (rrp)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2019
10 10 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 12:42 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF Michael DeGuzman, (Carter, Dayna)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Fri 11:34 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT filed by Defendant United Airlines, Inc.. (Riaz, Jibraun)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 9:51 AM
INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2019
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 4:17 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 4:17 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 9:42 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant United Airlines, Inc., re Corporate Disclosure Statement4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 served on March 7, 2019. (Riaz, Jibraun)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2019
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 1:04 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant United Airlines, Inc. (Riaz, Jibraun)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 1:03 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant United Airlines, Inc., (Riaz, Jibraun)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 12:59 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant United Airlines, Inc.. (Riaz, Jibraun)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 12:57 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019 01046735-CU-OE-CJC Receipt No: 0973-23335634 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant United Airlines, Inc.. (Attorney Jibraun Riaz added to party United Airlines, Inc.(pty:dft))(Riaz, Jibraun)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - OCSC Civil Case Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Payment Receipt,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Notice of Cse Assignment,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Summons Issued on 2-1-19,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Summons to United Airlines,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Proof of Service of Summons,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Defendant's Answer to Complaint
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Fri 3:57 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 100, inclusive, United Airlines, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Michael DeGuzman. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/28/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 4:01 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michael DeGuzman, upon Defendant United Airlines, Inc. served on 2/5/2019, answer due 2/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Registered Agent, By Serving Carlos Paz-Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/11/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT H) (ghap)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Fri 4:04 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant United Airlines, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/4/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT I)(ghap)
Related: [-]