California Eastern District Court
Judge:William B Shubb
Referred: Edmund F Brennan
Case #: 2:19-cv-00412
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Apr 21, 2019 2:54 AM PDT
Defendant
Kelly Mitchell
8359 Elk Grove-Florin Road #103-83
Sacramento, CA 95829
Plaintiff
Dayle Ann Imperato
10087 Bond Road
Elk Grove, CA 95624


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, June 21, 2019
13 13 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 3:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): On the Court's own motion, the parties are hereby notified that8 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, Declaratory Relief and Damages now set for hearing on 7/1/2019 is taken off calendar and under submission, no appearance is necessary. The Court shall issue a separate order. (Kirksey Smith, K)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2019
12 12 respm Opposition to Motion Mon 12:19 PM
OPPOSITION by Sid M. Rosenberg to8 Motion for Summary Judgment.(Rosenberg, Sid)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Plaintiff's Objection to Evidence ISO Opposition to Defendant's MSJ,
Att: 2 Plaintiff's Separate Statement in Response to Defendant's Statement of Undisputed Facts ISO MSJ,
Att: 3 Declaration of Dayle A. Imperato ISO Opposition to MSJ,
Att: 4 Proof of Service
11 11 respm Opposition to Motion Mon 12:06 PM
OPPOSITION by Dayle Ann Imperato, Sid M. Rosenberg to8 Motion for Summary Judgment. Attorney Rosenberg, Sid M. added.(Rosenberg, Sid)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Plaintiff's Objection to Evidence ISO Opposition to Defendant's MSJ,
Att: 2 Plaintiff's Separate Statement in Response to Defendant's Statement of Undisputed Facts ISO MSJ,
Att: 3 Declaration of Dayle A. Imperato ISO Opposition to MSJ,
Att: 4 Proof of Service
Monday, May 20, 2019
10 10 order Minute Order Mon 4:42 PM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): BY ORDER OF SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM B. SHUBB: The Court GRANTS leave for defendant Kelly Mitchell to file electronically via the court's CM//ECF filing system. Henceforth, no other party, other than any retained counsel by the defendant, may electronically file on behalf of defendant Kelly Mitchell. cc: Sac Ops Supervisor. (Kirksey Smith, K)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 5:04 AM
NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Krista Mitchell - PRO SE E-FILER.(Mitchell - PRO SE E-FILER, Krista)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service By Mail 05202019
8 8 motion Summary Judgment Mon 4:29 AM
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Kelly Mitchell. Attorney Mitchell - PRO SE E-FILER, Krista added. Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb.(Mitchell - PRO SE E-FILER, Krista)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Undisputed Facts,
Att: 2 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 3 Notice of Lodging Electronic Media,
Att: 4 Declaration Kelly Mitchell,
Att: 5 Declaration Krista Mitchell,
Att: 6 Declaration Frederick Mitchell re: Notice,
Att: 7 Proof of Service By Mail
service Service by Mail Mon 4:43 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL: 10 Minute Order re defendant's permission to file electronically, served on Dayle Ann Imperato. (Kirksey Smith, K)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2019
7 7 misc Civil New Case Documents for WBS Fri 2:42 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/16/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kirksey Smith, K)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Minute Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 2:41 PM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): By Order of Senior Judge William B. Shubb, the Court hereby GRANTS2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. This case shall not be referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge, Edmund F. Brennan, pursuant to Local Rule 302(c), and shall remain with the presiding District Judge, William B. Shubb, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. cc: Sac Ops Supvsr. (Kirksey Smith, K)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Fri 2:41 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL: 6 Minute Order GRANTING2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, served on Dayle Ann Imperato, Kelly Mitchell. (Kirksey Smith, K)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Fri 2:45 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:7 Civil New Case Documents for WBS served on Dayle Ann Imperato, Kelly Mitchell. (Kirksey Smith, K)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2019
misc Mail Returned Mon 9:38 AM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable-Moved:5 Order Reassigning Case sent to Kelly Mitchell. Notice of Change of Address due by 6/17/2019. (York, M)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2019
5 5 3 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 11:02 AM
ORDER RELATING CASES signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/19/19 ORDERING that the actions denominated 2:19-cv-297 WBS EFB, 2:19-cv-411 MCE KJN, 2:19-cv-412 TLN EFB and 2:19-cv-439 TLN KJN be, and the same hereby are, deemed related and shall be reassigned to Senior Judge William B. Shubb and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan for all further proceedings. Any dates currently set in the reassigned cases only are hereby VACATED. Henceforth, the captions on documents filed in the reassigned cases shall be shown as 2:19-cv-411 WBS EFB, 2:19-cv-412 WBS EFB, and 2:19-cv-439 WBS EFB. (Kaminski, H)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Wed 11:02 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:5 Order, served on Dayle Ann Imperato, Kelly Mitchell. (Kaminski, H)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2019
4 4 service Certificate of Service Fri 11:25 AM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Kelly Mitchell (Krista Mitchell) re1 Notice of Removal. (York, M)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Certificate of Service Fri 11:22 AM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Kelly Mitchell re1 Notice of Removal. (York, M)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion In Forma Pauperis Thu 11:45 AM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Kelly Mitchell. (Zignago, K.)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 11:44 AM
NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento Superior Court, Case number 34 2019 70005259 filed by Kelly Mitchell. (Zignago, K.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc IFP Application Thu 11:45 AM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Zignago, K.)
Related: [-]