California Central District Court
Judge:Virginia A Phillips
Referred: Alexander F Mackinnon
Case #: 2:19-cv-01715
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2019
Terminated:Jul 02, 2019
Last checked: Monday Apr 22, 2019 1:20 AM PDT
Defendant
Mag Park, LLC
Represented By
Benjamin Leventhal Hicks
Shumener Odson And Oh LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Brian Whitaker
Represented By
Chris Carson
Center For Disability Access
contact info
Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Center For Disability Access
contact info
Phyl Grace
Center For Disability Access
contact info
Dennis Jay Price, II
Center For Disability Access
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/18/2019 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
24 24 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 1:28 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, re Notice of Settlement23 : The Court having been advised by counsel for the parties that the above-entitled action has settled, IT IS ORDERED that this action be, and hereby is, dismissed in its entirety without prejudice. THE COURT to retain jurisdiction for a period of sixty (60) days to enforce the terms of the settlement. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2019
23 23 notice Settlement Fri 1:56 PM
NOTICE of Settlement and request to vacate all currently set dates filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker.(Carson, Chris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 26, 2019
22 22 adr Mediation Report (ADR-3) Completely Settled Wed 11:12 PM
MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Phyllis W Cheng: Mediation held on June 26, 2019 and the case has been completely settled. With the filing of this Report, the parties are advised that they must notify the trial judge's deputy courtroom clerk of the fact of settlement and to promptly file documents regarding the final disposition of the case. Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link:[LINK:MediationParticipantSurvey] (Cheng, Phyllis)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2019
21 21 misc Response Fri 1:27 PM
RESPONSE filed by Defendant Mag Park, LLCto Statement17 (Shumener, Betty)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2019
20 20 adr Notice of Mediation Date (ADR-13) Thu 10:36 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATION DATE filed. Mediation set for June 26, 2019.(Cheng, Phyllis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2019
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Tue 2:09 PM
NOTICE of Unavailability of Counsel filed by Defendant Mag Park, LLC. (Hicks, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
18 18 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) Tue 11:47 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Phyllis W Cheng has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2019
17 17 misc Statement Mon 12:45 PM
STATEMENT Plaintiff's Case Statement filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker re: Order on Application to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-22),16 . (Price, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2019
16 16 order Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-22) Mon 5:34 PM
ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: granting12 APPLICATION to Stay Case re Early Mediation ADA Disability Access Litigation as to Mag Park, LLC a California Limited Liability Company. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than 7/11/2019. (bm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2019
15 15 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form Mon 4:03 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS13 RE: Answer11 , Application12 , by Clerk of Court that the document is accepted as filed. Other: Defendant shall file it's Notice of Interested Parties forthwith. (bm)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 1:25 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mag Park, LLC, (Hicks, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Mon 10:18 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer11 , APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation,12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Application to Stay is incorrectly noticed for court hearing and should not be noticed for court hearing. Proposed orde ADR-22 should have been submitted as a separate, addtional attachment to the Application In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2019
12 12 motion Stay Case and Early Mediation (ADR-21) Thu 3:06 PM
APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendant Mag Park, LLC. Application set for hearing on 5/6/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Hicks, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 2:50 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Mag Park, LLC.(Attorney Benjamin Leventhal Hicks added to party Mag Park, LLC(pty:dft))(Hicks, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2019
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 6:17 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Mag Park, LLC served on 3/25/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Steven Rodriguez (Store Manager/ Authorized in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2019
9 9 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 11:43 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only8 served on 3/15/2019. (Carson, Chris)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 3:18 PM
STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2019
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 12:55 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Mag Park, LLC. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 12:44 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 12:44 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2019
4 4 notice Summons Request Fri 2:03 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Carson, Chris)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 2:02 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Carson, Chris)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 2:01 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Carson, Chris)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 1:59 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23339879 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris)
Related: [-]