Alex Morgan et al v. United States Soccer Federation, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | R Gary Klausner |
Referred: | Alicia G Rosenberg |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-01717 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:206 Collect Unpaid Wages |
Case Filed: | Mar 08, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 13, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 04, 2019 1:28 AM PDT |
Defendant
United States Soccer Federation, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samantha Mewis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
McCall Zerboni
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andi Sullivan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emily Sonnett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Casey Short
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Becky Sauerbrunn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Megan Rapinoe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mallory Pugh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christen Press
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelley OHara
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alyssa Naeher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alex Morgan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Morgan Brian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica McDonald
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Merritt Mathias
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allie Long
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carli Lloyd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rose Lavelle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lindsey Horan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tobin Heath
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashlyn Harris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adrianna Franch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julie Ertz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Crystal Dunn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tierna Davidson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Abby Dahlkemper
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danielle Colaprico
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Campbell
|
Represented By
|
1. | Federal Court Decision Propels US Women's National Soccer Team Equal Pay Lawsuit (outsports.com) |
Submitted Tue 11/12/2019 | |
2. | U.S. Womens Soccer Team Sues U.S. Soccer for Gender Discrimination (nytimes.com) |
Submitted Fri 03/08/2019 | |
3. | U.S. Women's Team Sues Soccer Federation, Alleging Gender Discrimination (wsj.com) |
Submitted Sun 03/10/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, February 03, 2023 | ||
356 | 356
appeal
USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order
Fri 02/03 4:37 PM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,,308 filed by Lindsey Horan, Tobin Heath, Emily Sonnett, Crystal Dunn, Jessica McDonald, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Mallory Pugh, Samantha Mewis, Abby Dahlkemper, Kelley OHara, Tierna Davidson, Ashlyn Harris, Morgan Brian, Rose Lavelle, Merritt Mathias, Christen Press, Jane Campbell, Megan Rapinoe, Alex Morgan, Casey Short, Andi Sullivan, Adrianna Franch, Alyssa Naeher, Danielle Colaprico, McCall Zerboni, Becky Sauerbrunn, Julie Ertz. CCA # 21-55356 The parties motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal is GRANTED. Each party shall bear its own costs and fees on appeal. This shall serve as the mandate of the court. IT IS SO ORDERED. (mat) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2023 | ||
355 | 355
appeal
USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order
Thu 02/02 10:59 AM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,,308 filed by Lindsey Horan, Tobin Heath, Emily Sonnett, Crystal Dunn, Jessica McDonald, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Mallory Pugh, Samantha Mewis, Abby Dahlkemper, Kelley OHara, Tierna Davidson, Ashlyn Harris, Morgan Brian, Rose Lavelle, Merritt Mathias, Christen Press, Jane Campbell, Megan Rapinoe, Alex Morgan, Casey Short, Andi Sullivan, Adrianna Franch, Alyssa Naeher, Danielle Colaprico, McCall Zerboni, Becky Sauerbrunn, Julie Ertz. CCA # 21-55356 On June 21, 2022, the panel granted the parties' joint motion for a limited remand under Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 12(b)(1). Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, the parties shall show cause why, in view of the district courts January 4, 2023 order, the panel should not dismiss this appeal. IT IS SO ORDERED. (mat) |