California Central District Court
Judge:Consuelo B Marshall
Referred: Michael R Wilner
Case #: 2:19-cv-01746
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2019
Last checked: Monday Apr 22, 2019 2:02 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Playgo Art and Craft Manufactory Limited
Represented By
Kevin Viau
Intellectual Property Law Group LLP
contact info
Leila N Sockolov
Intellectual Property Law Group LLP
contact info
Otto O Lee
Intellectual Property Law Group LLP
contact info
Defendant
Playgo Toys Enterprises Limited
Represented By
Kevin Viau
Intellectual Property Law Group LLP
contact info
Leila N Sockolov
Intellectual Property Law Group LLP
contact info
Otto O Lee
Intellectual Property Law Group LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Swift Harvest USA, LLC
Represented By
Hana S Kim
Reuben Raucher And Blum
contact info
Stephen L Raucher
Reuben Raucher And Blum
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, April 16, 2019
15 15 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Tue 10:44 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Playgo Toys Enterprises Limited answer now due 5/16/2019; Playgo Art and Craft Manufactory Limited answer now due 5/16/2019, filed by Defendants Playgo Toys Enterprises Limited; Playgo Art and Craft Manufactory Limited.(Attorney Leila N Sockolov added to party Playgo Art and Craft Manufactory Limited(pty:dft), Attorney Leila N Sockolov added to party Playgo Toys Enterprises Limited(pty:dft))(Sockolov, Leila)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2019
14 14 3 pgs service Summons Returned Unexecuted Mon 1:46 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Plaintiff Swift Harvest USA, LLC. as to Playgo Art and Craft Manufactory Limited. Proof of Service of Summons re Certified Mail, Return Receipt not Returned nor signed by defendant (shb)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Mon 1:43 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Plaintiff Swift Harvest USA, LLC. as to Playgo Toys Enterprises Limited. Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint by Service re Certified Mail, Return Receipt Not Returned (shb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2019
12 12 misc Receipt for Foreign Service (CV-75) Fri 12:54 PM
RECEIPT FOR FOREIGN SERVICE from U. S. Post Office for documents Re: ( Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form7 , Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification)4 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only10 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)8 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 ) mailed to Defendant Playgo Art &Craft Manufactory Limited:, 12th Floor, Tower 1, South Seas Centre 75 Mody Road, Tsim Sha Tsui East, Kowloon, Hong Kong on March 18, 2019 (shb)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Receipt for Foreign Service (CV-75) Fri 8:04 AM
RECEIPT FOR FOREIGN SERVICE from U. S. Post Office for documents Re: ( Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form7 , Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification)4 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only10 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)9 ) mailed to Playgo Toys Enterprises Limited, 12th Floor, Tower 1, South Seas Centre 75 Mody Road, Tsim Sha Tsui East, Kowloon, Hong Kong on 3/18/2019 (shb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
10 10 7 pgs order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 8:29 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2019
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 5:15 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Playgo Toys Enterprises Limited. (et)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 5:14 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Playgo Art and Craft Manufactory Limited. (et)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 5:00 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (et)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2019
6 6 notice Summons Request Fri 5:54 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Swift Harvest USA, LLC. (Raucher, Stephen)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Summons Request Fri 5:52 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Swift Harvest USA, LLC. (Raucher, Stephen)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Fri 5:50 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Swift Harvest USA, LLC. (Raucher, Stephen)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 5:48 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Swift Harvest USA, LLC, identifying Aquawood LLC; Banzai International Limited; and Focus Brand Limited. (Raucher, Stephen)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 5:45 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Swift Harvest USA, LLC. (Raucher, Stephen)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 5:36 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23347542 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Swift Harvest USA, LLC. (Attorney Stephen L Raucher added to party Swift Harvest USA, LLC(pty:pla))(Raucher, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - C