California Eastern District Court
Judge:Gary S Austin
Case #: 1:19-cv-00313
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:402 Social Security Benefits
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2019
Defendant
Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff
Rhonda Stetson

GPO Mar 11 2019
ORDER Granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 03/11/2019. (Flores, E)

Docket last updated: 04/19/2019 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 05, 2019
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 9:01 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Commissioner of Social Security served on 3/14/2019, answer due 5/14/2019. (Marrujo, C)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2019
8 8 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge Wed 10:46 AM
CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Porter, Ben A. added. (Porter, Ben)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2019
7 7 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge Fri 10:40 AM
CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Rhonda Stetson. (Pena, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Submitting Documents to USM Fri 10:40 AM
NOTICE OF SUBMITTING SERVICE DOCUMENTS to the U.S. Marshal by Rhonda Stetson pursuant to order of the court. (Pena, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2019
5 5 order Social Security New Case Documents for MJ as Presider Mon 12:10 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL; Consent or Decline due by 6/13/2019. (Flores, E)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order re Consent,
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 USM-285 Forms
4 4 service Summons Mon 12:07 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *Pena & Bromberg, Attorneys at Law* *2440 Tulare St., Suite 320* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Flores, E)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 12:03 PM
ORDER Granting2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 03/11/2019. (Flores, E)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2019
misc IFP Application Fri 8:48 AM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Sant Agata, S)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2019
2 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Rhonda Stetson.(Pena, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP Motion
1 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Rhonda Stetson.(Pena, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet