California Eastern District Court
Judge:Troy L Nunley
Case #: 2:19-cv-00406
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2019

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, March 19, 2019
7 7 misc Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case Tue 9:18 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. The new case number is: 2:19-cv-0406-TLN-KJN (PC). (Coll, A)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Tue 9:19 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL: 7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Michael Aaron Witkin. (Coll, A)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2019
6 6 misc Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge Tue 9:14 AM
DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Michael Aaron Witkin. (Coll, A)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2019
5 5 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Tue 3:32 PM
PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Michael Aaron Witkin. (Huang, H)
Related: [-]
misc Notice re IFP Submission Mon 11:44 AM
CLERKS NOTICE(text only): The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Michael Aaron Witkin, CDCR# F-08703 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Yin, K)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2019
4 4 order Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider Fri 3:30 PM
PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 4/11/2019 (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order re Consent
service Service by Mail Fri 3:31 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Michael Aaron Witkin. (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2019
3 3 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 3:30 PM
MOTION for RELIEF from E-FILING PROGRAM by Michael Aaron Witkin. (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion In Forma Pauperis Fri 3:29 PM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Michael Aaron Witkin. (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint Fri 3:29 PM
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Michael Aaron Witkin.(Benson, A.)
Related: [-]