California Eastern District Court
Judge:Deborah Barnes
Case #: 2:19-cv-00416
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2019

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, March 22, 2019
4 4 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge Mon 1:09 PM
CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Anthony Dewayne Lee Turner. (Coll, A)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2019
3 3 order Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider Fri 10:50 AM
PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 4/11/2019. (Coll, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order re Consent
2 2 motion In Forma Pauperis Fri 10:48 AM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Anthony Dewayne Lee Turner. (Coll, A)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Fri 10:51 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Anthony Dewayne Lee Turner. (Coll, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2019
1 1 cmp Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint Fri 10:46 AM
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Anthony Dewayne Lee Turner.(Coll, A)
Related: [-]