The Estate of Daniel Hambrick v. Metropolitan Government of Nashville-Davidson County, Tennessee (Metro) et al
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Waverly D Crenshaw, Jr |
Referred: | Barbara D Holmes |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-00216 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 11, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 31, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2019 4:05 AM CDT |
Defendant
Andrew Delke
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Metropolitan Government of Nashville-Davidson County, Tennessee (Metro)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Estate of Daniel Hambrick
|
Represented By
|
1. | Federal lawsuit filed by family of Daniel Hambrick formally dismissed in court (wkrn.com) |
Submitted Thu 04/01/2021 | |
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, March 31, 2021 | ||
67 | 67
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 03/31 12:21 PM
ORDER: The parties have filed a Stipulation of Dismissal (Doc. No.66 ). Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and the Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 3/31/2021. (ln) |
|
Tuesday, March 30, 2021 | ||
66 | 66
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 03/30 5:54 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Daniel Hambrick. (Mothershead, Kyle) |