California Central District Court
Judge:R Gary Klausner
Referred: Rozella A Oliver
Case #: 2:19-cv-01770
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 12, 2019 1:15 AM PDT
Defendant
Lydia Bueno
Defendant
COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES,
Represented By
Ryan Augustine Graham
Peterson Bradford Burkwitz LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does 1-50
Defendant
Gladys Escobedo
Represented By
Ryan Augustine Graham
Peterson Bradford Burkwitz LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ruben Jimenez
Represented By
Ryan Augustine Graham
Peterson Bradford Burkwitz LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sandra Jimenez
Represented By
Ryan Augustine Graham
Peterson Bradford Burkwitz LLP
contact info
Defendant
Antonia Lopez
Represented By
Ryan Augustine Graham
Peterson Bradford Burkwitz LLP
contact info
Defendant
Los Angeles Department of Children and Family Services
Represented By
Ryan Augustine Graham
Peterson Bradford Burkwitz LLP
contact info
Defendant
Laura Luna
Represented By
Ryan Augustine Graham
Peterson Bradford Burkwitz LLP
contact info
Defendant
Gloria Mejia
Represented By
Ryan Augustine Graham
Peterson Bradford Burkwitz LLP
contact info
Defendant
Stephanie Morales
Represented By
Ryan Augustine Graham
Peterson Bradford Burkwitz LLP
contact info
Defendant
Espinoza Officer
Defendant
Pacheco Officer
Defendant
Melissa Ramirez
Represented By
Ryan Augustine Graham
Peterson Bradford Burkwitz LLP
contact info
Defendant
Alexandra Ronces
Represented By
Ryan Augustine Graham
Peterson Bradford Burkwitz LLP
contact info
Defendant
Evita Salas
Represented By
Ryan Augustine Graham
Peterson Bradford Burkwitz LLP
contact info
Defendant
Rachel Simons
Represented By
Ryan Augustine Graham
Peterson Bradford Burkwitz LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alfredo C Aranda
Plaintiff
Karla Aranda


Docket last updated: 03/22/2019 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, March 15, 2019
19 19 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Fri 5:42 PM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Antonia Lopez answer now due 4/17/2019; Sandra Jimenez answer now due 4/17/2019; Gloria Mejia answer now due 4/17/2019; Melissa Ramirez answer now due 4/17/2019; County of Los Angeles answer now due 4/17/2019; Gladys Escobedo answer now due 4/17/2019; Rachel Simons answer now due 4/17/2019; Laura Luna answer now due 4/17/2019; Stephanie Morales answer now due 4/17/2019; Alexandra Ronces answer now due 4/17/2019; Evita Salas answer now due 4/17/2019; Ruben Jimenez answer now due 4/17/2019, filed by Defendants Antonia Lopez; Sandra Jimenez; Gloria Mejia; Melissa Ramirez; County of Los Angeles; Gladys Escobedo; Rachel Simons; Laura Luna; Stephanie Morales; Alexandra Ronces; Evita Salas; Ruben Jimenez.(Graham, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
18 18 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 5:39 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Karla Garcia Aranda, B. A., upon Defendant Sandra Jimenez served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Christina Lee, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McNicholas, John)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 5:37 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Karla Garcia Aranda, B. A., upon Defendant Laura Luna served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Christina Lee, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McNicholas, John)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 5:34 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Karla Garcia Aranda, B. A., upon Defendant Stephanie Morales served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Christina Lee, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McNicholas, John)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 5:32 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Karla Garcia Aranda, B. A., upon Defendant Gloria Mejia served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Christina Lee, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McNicholas, John)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 5:29 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Karla Garcia Aranda, B. A., upon Defendant Rachel Simons served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Christina Lee, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McNicholas, John)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 5:24 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Karla Garcia Aranda, B. A., upon Defendant Antonia Lopez served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Christina Lee, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McNicholas, John)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 5:22 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Karla Garcia Aranda, B. A., upon Defendant Evita Salas served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Christina Lee, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McNicholas, John)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 5:19 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Karla Garcia Aranda, B. A., upon Defendant Gladys Escobedo served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Christina Lee, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McNicholas, John)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 5:16 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Karla Garcia Aranda, B. A., upon Defendant Alexandra Ronces served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Christina Lee, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McNicholas, John)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 5:12 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Karla Garcia Aranda, B. A., upon Defendant Melissa Ramirez served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Christina Lee, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McNicholas, John)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 4:54 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Karla Garcia Aranda, B. A., upon Defendant Ruben Jimenez served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Christina Lee, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McNicholas, John)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 4:42 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Karla Garcia Aranda, B. A., upon Defendant Los Angeles Department of Children and Family Services served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jimmy Prieto, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McNicholas, John)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 8:19 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 3:49 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 3:49 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2019
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 4:00 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES,, Gladys Escobedo, Ruben Jimenez, Sandra Jimenez, Antonia Lopez, Los Angeles Department of Children and Family Services, Laura Luna, Gloria Mejia, Stephanie Morales, Melissa Ramirez, Alexandra Ronces, Evita Salas, Rachel Simons. (Graham, Ryan)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 3:58 PM
CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES,, Gladys Escobedo, Ruben Jimenez, Sandra Jimenez, Antonia Lopez, Los Angeles Department of Children and Family Services, Laura Luna, Gloria Mejia, Stephanie Morales, Melissa Ramirez, Alexandra Ronces, Evita Salas, Rachel Simons, identifying County of Los Angeles, Los Angeles Department of Children and Family Services; Gladys Escobedo; Ruben Jimenez; Sandra Jimenez; Ilana Lara; Antonia Lopez; Laura Luna; Gloria Mejia; Stephanie Morales; Melissa Ramirez; Alexandra Ronces; Evita Salas; Officer Espinoza; Officer Pacheco;Lydia Bueno; Karla Aranda and Alfredo Arando. (Graham, Ryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 3:51 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC717776 Receipt No: 0973-23354286 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Antonia Lopez, Sandra Jimenez, Gloria Mejia, Melissa Ramirez, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES,, Gladys Escobedo, Rachel Simons, Laura Luna, Stephanie Morales, Alexandra Ronces, Los Angeles Department of Children and Family Services, Evita Salas, Ruben Jimenez. (Attorney Ryan Augustine Graham added to party COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES,(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan Augustine Graham added to party Gladys Escobedo(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan Augustine Graham added to party Ruben Jimenez(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan Augustine Graham added to party Sandra Jimenez(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan Augustine Graham added to party Antonia Lopez(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan Augustine Graham added to party Los Angeles Department of Children and Family Services(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan Augustine Graham added to party Laura Luna(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan Augustine Graham added to party Gloria Mejia(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan Augustine Graham added to party Stephanie Morales(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan Augustine Graham added to party Melissa Ramirez(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan Augustine Graham added to party Alexandra Ronces(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan Augustine Graham added to party Evita Salas(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan Augustine Graham added to party Rachel Simons(pty:dft))(Graham, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Ryan Graham,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Tue 3:52 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Lydia Bueno, County of Los Angeles, Does, Gladys Escobedo, Espinoza, Ruben Jimenez, Sandra Jimenez, Antonia Lopez, Los Angeles Department of Children and Family Services, Laura Luna, Gloria Mejia, Stephanie Morales, Pacheco, Melissa Ramirez, Alexandra Ronces, Evita Salas, Rachel Simons. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Alfredo Aranda, Karla Garcia Aranda, B. A.1 [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/15/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL] (lh)
Related: [-]