California Central District Court
Judge:Josephine L Staton
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 8:19-cv-00471
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2019
Terminated:Apr 22, 2019
Last checked: Thursday Apr 25, 2019 1:49 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Franchise Investment Corporation
Plaintiff
Nehemiah Kong
Represented By
Chris Carson
Center For Disability Access
contact info
Phyl Grace
Center For Disability Access
contact info
Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Center For Disability Access
contact info
Dennis Jay Price, II
Center For Disability Access
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, June 10, 2019
15 15 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Mon 10:18 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. Dismissal is with prejudice.(Carson, Chris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Wednesday, May 22, 2019
14 14 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 3:19 PM
ORDER EXTENDING DATE FOR FILING DISMISSAL by Judge Josephine L. Staton, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File13 : Plaintiff NEHEMIAH KONG ("Plaintiff") and Defendant FRANCHISE INVESTMENT CORPORATION, a California Corporation ("Defendant") hereby stipulate to extend the deadline to file Dismissal to June 20, 2019. (bm)
Related: [-]
13 13 stip Extension of Time to File Document Wed 3:48 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Dismissal filed by plaintiff Nehemiah Kong.(Carson, Chris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, April 22, 2019
12 12 order Staying Case ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 5:54 PM
ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING FINAL SETTLEMENT, REMOVING CASE FROM ACTIVE CASELOAD, AND FILING OF DISMISSAL by Judge Josephine L. Staton that the case has fully settled. Based thereon, the Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case stayed pending final settlement. Further ordered that this action is removed from the Court's active caseload. The parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal no later than 5/22/2019 (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Settlement Mon 1:42 PM
NOTICE of Settlement and request to vacate all currently set dates filed by plaintiff Nehemiah Kong.(Carson, Chris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
Wednesday, April 03, 2019
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 6:45 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, upon Defendant Franchise Investment Corporation served on 3/30/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe (Co-Manager) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2019
9 9 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Thu 11:40 AM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (kd)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 11:15 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (kd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 12:46 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Franchise Investment Corporation. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 12:44 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 12:43 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (et)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2019
4 4 notice Summons Request Mon 9:34 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Carson, Chris)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 9:33 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, (Carson, Chris)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 9:29 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Carson, Chris)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 9:27 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23349194 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Nehemiah Kong(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris)
Related: [-]