California Central District Court
Judge:James V Selna
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 8:19-cv-00474
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause42:405 Fair Housing Act
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2019
Last checked: Thursday Apr 25, 2019 2:26 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Eastwood
Plaintiff
Roy Davis Gash
Represented By
David C Wakefield
Law Office Of David C Wakefield
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, June 07, 2019
10 10 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Fri 9:08 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs Roy Davis Gash. Dismissal is WITHOUT Prejudice. (Wakefield, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2019
9 9 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Tue 11:57 AM
Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference by Judge James V. Selna. Scheduling Conference set for 6/17/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (rrp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 8:41 AM
INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 11:42 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Eastwood. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 11:37 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 11:37 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (et)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2019
4 4 notice Summons Request Mon 2:00 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiffs Roy Davis Gash. (Wakefield, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 1:59 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Roy Davis Gash, identifying Eastwood. (Wakefield, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 1:59 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Roy Davis Gash. (Wakefield, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 1:58 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23352649 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Roy Davis Gash. (Attorney David C Wakefield added to party Roy Davis Gash(pty:pla))(Wakefield, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A To Complaint