Diaz v. Full Steam Staffing LLC, et al
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Dale A Drozd |
Referred: | Erica P Grosjean |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-00326 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Mar 08, 2019 |
Terminated: | Nov 06, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 04, 2019 1:47 AM PDT |
Defendant
Full Steam Staffing LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Claudia Diaz
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, November 06, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 11/06 7:44 AM
ORDER re Stipulated Request for Dismissal of Entire Action With Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/5/2020 pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C) |
|
Tuesday, October 27, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Stipulation
Tue 10/27 12:20 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Entire Action with Prejudice by Full Steam Staffing LLC. (Rose, Annette) |
|
Friday, June 19, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 06/19 7:41 AM
MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/19/2020. Jury Trial date given was incorrect. Jury Trial currently set for 7/28/2021 is ADVANCED to 7/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Thorp, J) |
|
Thursday, June 18, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 06/18 5:03 PM
Order GRANTING stipulated modification of scheduling order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/18/2020. (Non Expert Discovery due by 9/17/2020; Expert Disclosure due by 10/15/2020; Expert Discovery due by 12/17/2020; Dispositive Motions filed by 12/10/2020; Pretrial Conference currently set for 2/22/2021 has been CONTINUED to 5/24/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd; Jury Trial currently set for 4/27/2021 has been CONTINUED to 7/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd ) (Rosales, O.) |
|
Wednesday, June 17, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 06/17 5:38 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Modify Scheduling Order re24 Order,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings,,, by Full Steam Staffing LLC. (Rose, Annette) |
|
Wednesday, April 08, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Wed 04/08 4:55 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MODIFICATION OF SCHEDULING ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference Order (ECF No.14 ), as previously modified (ECF No. 21 ), is further modified as follows: Non-expert discovery due by 6/19/2020. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 7/17/2020. Designation of Rebuttal Expert Witnesses due by 8/14/2020. Dispositive Motions filed by 9/11/2020. Expert Discovery cutoff by 9/18/2020. Pretrial Conference currently set for 11/16/2020 is CONTINUED to 2/22/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Jury Trial currently set for 2/2/2021 is CONTINUED to 4/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/7/2020. (Apodaca, P) |
|
Tuesday, April 07, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 04/07 12:56 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Modify Scheduling Order re14 Scheduling Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings,, by Full Steam Staffing LLC. (Rose, Annette) |
|
Tuesday, February 04, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
order
Standing Order re Judicial Emergency
Tue 02/04 10:15 AM
STANDING ORDER in Light of Judicial Emergency in the Eastern District of California (Lundstrom, T) |
|
Thursday, January 23, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 01/23 1:53 PM
MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean: MID-DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/23/2020. After discussion with the parties, the Court amended the scheduling order, document14 , as follows: Non-Expert Discovery due by 3/20/2020; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 4/17/2020; Rebuttal Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 5/15/2020; and Expert Discovery due by 6/19/2020, with all other dates to remain as previously set. The Court also heard/addressed a discovery issue, with defendant Full Steam Staffing, LLC, to request an informal discovery dispute conference if the discovery responses requested are not received. Plaintiff's Counsel Patrick Hormillosa (special appearance) telephonically present. Defendants' Counsel Beatriz Berumen telephonically present on behalf of defendant Full Steam Staffing, LLC, and Michael Baytosh and Michael Hughes telephonically present on behalf of defendant John B. Sanfilippo and Son, Inc. (Rooney, M) |
|
Thursday, January 16, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Status Report
Thu 01/16 4:56 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Full Steam Staffing LLC. (Rose, Annette) |
|
Wednesday, January 15, 2020 | ||
adr
Completion of VDRP
Wed 01/15 1:10 PM
NOTICE OF COMPLETION of VDRP. This case has completed the VDRP process. Case not settled.[TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Crouch, J) |
||
Tuesday, October 29, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 10/29 4:09 PM
Order GRANTING stipulated extension of time to complete voluntary dispute resolution ("VDRP"), signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/28/2019. (Mid-Discovery Status Conference currently set for 12/9/2019 has been CONTINUED to 1/23/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean ) (Rosales, O.) |
|
Monday, October 28, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 10/28 11:35 AM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extending Time to Complete VDRP by Full Steam Staffing LLC. Attorney Rose, Annette Louise added. (Rose, Annette) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
adr
Appointment of VDRP Neutral Attorney
Thu 08/22 12:33 PM
NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT from VDRP Administrator appointing Jeffery Owensby as VDRP Neutral Attorney.[TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Crouch, J) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Case Referred to VDRP
Thu 07/18 3:38 PM
ORDER of referral to VDRP, document15 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/18/2019. (Rooney, M) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
adr
Consent to VDRP
Wed 07/17 3:18 PM
CONSENT to VDRP by Claudia Diaz.(Lepera, Joseph) |
|
Monday, June 03, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 06/03 2:47 PM
Scheduling Conference Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/3/2019. (Initial Disclosures due by 6/13/2019; Mid Discovery Status Conference set for 12/9/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean ; Non Expert Discovery due by 2/28/2020; Expert Disclosure due by 3/30/2020; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure due by 4/29/2020; Expert Discovery due by 5/29/2020; Dispositive Motions filed by 7/13/2020; Pretrial Conference set for 11/16/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd; Jury Trial (5-7 days) set for 2/2/2021 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd ) (Rosales, O.) |
|
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Thu 05/30 2:46 PM
MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 5/30/2019 with an order to follow. After discussion with the parties, the Court directed them to meet and confer regarding settlement conference options and email Courtroom Deputy Michelle Rooney (mrooney@caed.uscourts.gov) by the close of business on 7/17/2019 regarding same. Plaintiff's Counsel Joseph Lepera telephonically present. Defendants' Counsel Beatriz Berumen, Annette Rose, Michael Baytosh, and Michael Hughes telephonically present. (Rooney, M) |
|
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Scheduling Report
Thu 05/23 10:53 AM
JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Full Steam Staffing LLC. Attorney Berumen, Beatriz added. (Berumen, Beatriz) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
order
Pro Hac Vice Order
Wed 03/20 10:42 AM
PRO HAC VICE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/19/19. Added attorney Jeffrey A. Risch, PHV for John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc. (Gonzalez, R) |
|
10 | 10
order
Pro Hac Vice Order
Wed 03/20 10:12 AM
PRO HAC VICE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/19/19. Added attorney Michael F. Hughes, PHV for John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc. (Gonzalez, R) |
|
Sunday, March 17, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Sun 03/17 10:48 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc.. (Baytosh, Michael) |
|
Saturday, March 16, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Sat 03/16 12:41 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Full Steam Staffing LLC.(Posard, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service Proof of Service of Answer and Corporate Disclosure Statement | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Sat 03/16 12:39 AM
ANSWER with Jury Demand by Full Steam Staffing LLC.(Posard, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service Proof of Service for Answer and Corporate Disclosure Statement | ||
Friday, March 15, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 03/15 3:40 PM
ANSWER with Jury Demand by John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc..(Baytosh, Michael) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order
Fri 03/15 11:04 AM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc. for attorney Michael F. Hughes to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8161694) (Baytosh, Michael) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order
Fri 03/15 11:01 AM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc. for attorney JEFFREY A. RISCH to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8161656) (Baytosh, Michael) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/11 3:52 PM
NOTICE Consent to Removal by Full Steam Staffing LLC re1 Notice of Removal. Attorney Posard, Mark added.(Posard, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil New Case Documents for DAD
Mon 03/11 2:14 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/30/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Gonzalez, R) |
|
Att: 1 Standing Order, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 3 VDRP | ||
Friday, March 08, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Merced Superior Court, case number 19CV-00582 by Claudia Diaz. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8151386)(Baytosh, Michael) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |