California Central District Court
Judge:Otis D Wright, II
Referred: Frederick F Mumm
Case #: 2:19-cv-01794
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2019 1:30 AM PDT
Defendant
DOES 1 through 10
Defendant
NEWTYPE HOLDINGS LLC
Plaintiff
SOON JA SONG
Represented By
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2019 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, March 15, 2019
8 8 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Fri 4:49 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-01794 ODW(FFMx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 3:26 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Newtype Holdings LLC. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 2:52 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 2:52 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 10:44 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff SOON JA SONG, (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 10:43 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff SOON JA SONG. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Tue 10:43 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff SOON JA SONG. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 10:42 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23358587 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff SOON JA SONG. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party SOON JA SONG(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]