California Central District Court
Judge:Dale S Fischer
Referred: Maria A Audero
Case #: 2:19-cv-01815
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2019 1:29 AM PDT
Defendant
DOES 1 through 10
Defendant
VALLEY SPOT, INC.
Plaintiff
MAL KIM
Represented By
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/22/2019 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, March 18, 2019
10 10 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Mon 2:35 PM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (vv)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 2:32 PM
STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (vv)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2019
8 8 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Fri 5:06 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-01815 DSF(MAAx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 9:47 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Valley Spot, Inc. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 9:44 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 9:43 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (car)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 5:46 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff MAL KIM, (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 5:45 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff MAL KIM. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Tue 5:45 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff MAL KIM. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 5:44 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23363963 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff MAL KIM. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party MAL KIM(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]