USA v. Abbott et al (Do not docket in this case. Docket in CR cases)
Massachusetts District Court | |
Case #: | 1:19-mj-06087 |
Case Filed: | Mar 11, 2019 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 29, 2019 10:01 AM EDT |
Defendant
Agustin Huneeus, Jr. (17)
|
|
Defendant
Robert Zangrillo (32)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Homayoun Zadeh (31)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Wilson (30)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Devin Sloane (29)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Stephen Semprevivo (28)
|
|
Defendant
Peter Jan Sartorio (27)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Marci Palatella (26)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
William McGlashan, Jr. (25)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Toby MacFarlane (24)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lori Loughlin (23)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Marjorie Klapper (22)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Elisabeth Kimmel (21)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michelle Janavs (20)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Davina Isackson (19)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bruce Isackson (18)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Marcia Abbott (2)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gamal Abdelaziz (3)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Diane Blake (4)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Todd Blake (5)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jane Buckingham (6)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gordon Caplan (7)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
I-Hsin Chen (8)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gregory Abbott (1)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert Flaxman (11)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mossimo Giannulli (12)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Elizabeth Henriquez (13)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Manuel Henriquez (14)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Douglas Hodge (15)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Felicity Huffman (16)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Amy Colburn (9)
Terminated: 03/28/2019
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gregory Colburn (10)
Terminated: 03/28/2019
|
Represented By
|
1. | Actress Felicity Huffman Due in Boston Court to Plead Guilty in Admissions Scheme (nbcconnecticut.com) |
Submitted Mon 05/13/2019 | |
2. | Felicity Huffman among 13 parents pleading guilty in admissions scandal - The Boston Globe (bostonglobe.com) |
Submitted Mon 04/08/2019 | |
3. | Two more parents are indicted in college admissions scandal (accountingtoday.com) |
Submitted Fri 03/29/2019 | |
4. | First wave of college admissions scandal defendants due in federal court (boston25news.com) |
Submitted Tue 03/26/2019 | |
5. | Feds uncovered the nationwide college admissions scandal by accident (abcnews.go.com) |
Submitted Thu 03/14/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 07/30/2020 6:05 AM EDT |
Monday, March 11, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 1 pgs MOTION to Seal Case as to Gregory Abbott, Marcia Abbott, Gamal Abdelaziz, Diane Blake, Todd Blake, Jane Buckingham, Gordon Caplan, I-Hsin Chen, Amy Colburn, Gregory Colburn, Robert Flaxman, Mossimo Giannulli, Elizabeth Henriquez, Manuel Henriquez, Douglas Hodge, Felicity Huffman, Agustin Huneeus, Jr, Bruce Isackson, Davina Isackson, Michelle Janavs, Elisabeth Kimmel, Marjorie Klapper, Lori Loughlin, Toby MacFarlane, William McGlashan, Jr, Marci Palatella, Peter Jan Sartorio, Stephen Semprevivo, Devin Sloane, John Wilson, Homayoun Zadeh, Robert Zangrillo by USA. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia) | |
2 | 2 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting1 Motion to Seal Case as to Gregory Abbott (1), Marcia Abbott (2), Gamal Abdelaziz (3), Diane Blake (4), Todd Blake (5), Jane Buckingham (6), Gordon Caplan (7), I-Hsin Chen (8), Amy Colburn (9), Gregory Colburn (10), Robert Flaxman (11), Mossimo Giannulli (12), Elizabeth Henriquez (13), Manuel Henriquez (14), Douglas Hodge (15), Felicity Huffman (16), Agustin Huneeus Jr. (17), Bruce Isackson (18), Davina Isackson (19), Michelle Janavs (20), Elisabeth Kimmel (21), Marjorie Klapper (22), Lori Loughlin (23), Toby MacFarlane (24), William McGlashan Jr. (25), Marci Palatella (26), Peter Jan Sartorio (27), Stephen Semprevivo (28), Devin Sloane (29), John Wilson (30), Homayoun Zadeh (31), Robert Zangrillo (32) (Alves-Baptista, Antonia) | |
3 | 3 1 pgs SEALED COMPLAINT as to Gregory Abbott (1), Marcia Abbott (2), Gamal Abdelaziz (3), Diane Blake (4), Todd Blake (5), Jane Buckingham (6), Gordon Caplan (7), I-Hsin Chen (8), Amy Colburn (9), Gregory Colburn (10), Robert Flaxman (11), Mossimo Giannulli (12), Elizabeth Henriquez (13), Manuel Henriquez (14), Douglas Hodge (15), Felicity Huffman (16), Agustin Huneeus, Jr (17), Bruce Isackson (18), Davina Isackson (19), Michelle Janavs (20), Elisabeth Kimmel (21), Marjorie Klapper (22), Lori Loughlin (23), Toby MacFarlane (24), William McGlashan, Jr (25), Marci Palatella (26), Peter Jan Sartorio (27), Stephen Semprevivo (28), Devin Sloane (29), John Wilson (30), Homayoun Zadeh (31), Robert Zangrillo (32).(Alves-Baptista, Antonia) | |
Att: 1 64 pgs JS45, | ||
Att: 2 46 pgs Affidavit pgs 1-46, | ||
Att: 3 75 pgs Affidavit pgs 47-121, | ||
Att: 4 52 pgs Affidavit pgs 122-173, | ||
Att: 5 31 pgs Affidavit 174-204 | ||
4 | 4 32 pgs Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley as to Gregory Abbott, Marcia Abbott, Gamal Abdelaziz, Diane Blake, Todd Blake, Jane Buckingham, Gordon Caplan, I-Hsin Chen, Amy Colburn, Gregory Colburn, Robert Flaxman, Mossimo Giannulli, Elizabeth Henriquez, Manuel Henriquez, Douglas Hodge, Felicity Huffman, Agustin Huneeus, Jr, Bruce Isackson, Davina Isackson, Michelle Janavs, Elisabeth Kimmel, Marjorie Klapper, Lori Loughlin, Toby MacFarlane, William McGlashan, Jr, Marci Palatella, Peter Jan Sartorio, Stephen Semprevivo, Devin Sloane, John Wilson, Homayoun Zadeh, Robert Zangrillo. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia) | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Gregory Abbott, Marcia Abbott, Gamal Abdelaziz, Diane Blake, Todd Blake, Jane Buckingham, Gordon Caplan, I-Hsin Chen, Amy Colburn, Gregory Colburn, Robert Flaxman, Mossimo Giannulli, Elizabeth Henriquez, Manuel Henriquez, Douglas Hodge, Felicity Huffman, Agustin Huneeus, Jr, Bruce Isackson, Davina Isackson, Michelle Janavs, Elisabeth Kimmel, Marjorie Klapper, Lori Loughlin, Toby MacFarlane, William McGlashan, Jr, Marci Palatella, Peter Jan Sartorio, Stephen Semprevivo, Devin Sloane, John Wilson, Homayoun Zadeh, Robert Zangrillo; Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley assigned to case. (Finn, Mary) |