Duran v. La Boom Disco Inc.
Original Case: 1:17-cv-06331
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-00600 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Case Filed: | Mar 08, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 07, 2020 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 09, 2020 4:31 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
La Boom Disco Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Radames Duran, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Apr 07 2020
OPINION, the district courtâ??s judgment is vacated and remanded the cause for further proceedings consistent with this opinion, by JAC, RJL, C. REISS, FILED.[2815165] [19-600] |
Docket last updated: 04/09/2020 4:26 AM EDT |