Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:19-bk-01890

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Catherine Peek Mcewen
Case #: 8:19-ap-00124
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
71 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - imposition of stay
11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2019
Terminated:Jun 25, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Skyport Holdings Tampa, LLC
6582 Eureka Springs Rd.
Tampa, FL 33610
Represented By
Skyport Holdings Tampa, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Hawk Aircraft Services, LLC
39317 Airpark Road
Zephyrhills, FL 33542
Represented By
Hawk Aircraft Services, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Christopher Nocco, Pasco County Sheriff
8700 Citizens Drive
New Port Richey, FL 34654
Represented By
Christopher Nocco, Pasco County Sheriff
contact info
Plaintiff
The Turin Aviation Group, LLC
122 Hickory Creek Blvd.
Brandon, FL 33511
Represented By
Alberto F Gomez, Jr.
Johnson Pope Bokor Ruppel & Burns, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, June 25, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Fri 06/25 7:56 AM
Adversary Case 8:19-ap-124 Closed. (Penny)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 03, 2021
court Compromise Cross-Reference Thu 06/03 3:33 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. 8:19-bk-01890-CPM, Doc. No. 326 . (Deborah K.)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 19, 2021
court Compromise Cross-Reference Wed 04/21 4:13 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. 8:19-bk-01890-CPM, Doc. No. 323 . (Tonya)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 15, 2021
49 49 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Thu 04/15 6:02 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Kevin Comer, Lynn Sherman, Heath Murphy RULING: Continued Status Conference ...Case Manager to set 60 day follow up tickle Related [+]... Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-] settlement docs
Wednesday, April 14, 2021
48 48 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 04/15 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/14/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #47 )
Monday, April 12, 2021
47 47 2 pgs order Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom Mon 04/12 12:58 PM
Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear Via Zoom. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 11, 2021
46 46 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Thu 02/11 8:44 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Lynn Sherman, Heath Murphy, Kevin Comer RULING: Status Conference ...Continued to 4/15/2021 at 11:00 a.m. - no further notice will be given... Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 20, 2020
45 45 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 12/21 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 12/20/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #43 )
Saturday, December 19, 2020
44 44 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice Sun 12/20 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 12/19/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #42 )
Friday, December 18, 2020
43 43 2 pgs order Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom Fri 12/18 2:30 PM
Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear Via Zoom. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2020
42 42 court Notice Canceling and/or Rescheduling Thu 12/17 10:37 AM
Notice Rescheduling Status Conference Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 2/11/2021 at 10:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Margaret)
Related: [-] 39
Sunday, November 22, 2020
41 41 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 11/23 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 11/22/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #40 )
Friday, November 20, 2020
40 40 2 pgs order Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom Fri 11/20 2:30 PM
Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear Via Zoom. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
39 39 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Wed 11/18 12:35 AM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Lynn Sherman, Angela Reimer, Heath Murphy (zoom), Kevin Comer (cc) RULING: STATUS CONFERENCE... ...Continued in open court to 1/29/2021 at 1:30 p.m. - no further notice will be given... ... Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 12, 2020
38 38 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 11/13 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 11/12/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #37 )
Tuesday, November 10, 2020
37 37 2 pgs order Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom Tue 11/10 2:30 PM
Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear Via Zoom. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 03, 2020
misc Electronic Service Text Entry (TEXT ONLY) Thu 09/03 9:15 AM
Service completed via CM/ECF electronic notification. Filed by Lynn Welter Sherman, Attorney for Trustee on behalf of Plaintiff Richard M. Dauval, as Chapter 7 Trustee of The Turin Aviation Group, LLC Related [+]. (Sherman, Attorney for Trustee, Lynn)
Related: [-] 36
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
36 36 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 09/02 11:57 AM
Order Granting Agreed Motion to Stay Adversary Proceeding and Continue All Pending Motions Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 11/17/2020 at 11:00 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Service Instructions: Lynn Sherman, Attorney for Trustee is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Ryan S.)
Related: [-] 34
35 35 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 09/02 10:55 AM
Notice of Hearing on Amd Motion for Contempt Filed by Angela M Reimer on behalf of Plaintiff The Turin Aviation Group, LLC Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 9/22/2020 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue.
Related: [-] imer, Angela
34 34 motion Motion to Stay Wed 09/02 8:04 AM
Agreed Motion to Stay Adversary Proceeding and Continue All Pending Motions Filed by Lynn Welter Sherman, Attorney for Trustee on behalf of Plaintiff Richard M. Dauval, as Chapter 7 Trustee of The Turin Aviation Group, LLC. (Sherman, Attorney for Trustee, Lynn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
court Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only Tue 09/01 10:38 AM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 09/22/2020 09:30 AM Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Re: Amended Motion For Contempt and for Show Cause Order and Memorandum in Support Doc [33)]. This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions: Angela M Reimer is directed to prepare, file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. Telephonic Appearance Requirement: Effective March 16, 2020, and continuing until further notice, Judges in all Divisions will conduct all preliminary and non-evidentiary hearings by telephone. For Judges Colton and Williamson, parties should arrange a telephonic appearance through Court Solutions (www.court-solutions.com). For Judges Delano, Funk, Jackson, Jennemann, McEwen, and Vaughan, parties should arrange a telephonic appearance through Court Call (866-582-6878). Failure to comply with the noticing instructions will result in cancellation of the hearing that addresses this specific matter. Related [+]. (Dkt)
Related: [-] 33
Friday, August 28, 2020
33 33 motion Motion for Contempt Fri 08/28 12:09 PM
Amended Motion For Contempt Filed by Angela M Reimer on behalf of Plaintiff The Turin Aviation Group, LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] imer, Angela
Wednesday, August 26, 2020
32 32 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 08/26 10:23 AM
Notice of Hearing on Motion for Contempt Filed by Angela M Reimer on behalf of Plaintiff The Turin Aviation Group, LLC Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 9/22/2020 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue.
Related: [-] imer, Angela
Monday, August 24, 2020
court Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only Mon 08/24 4:02 PM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 9/22/2020 9:30 am Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Re: Memorandum in Support of Motion For Contempt and for Show Cause Order Doc31 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions: Angela M Reimer is directed to prepare, file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. Telephonic Appearance Requirement: Effective March 16, 2020, and continuing until further notice, Judges in all Divisions will conduct all preliminary and non-evidentiary hearings by telephone. For Judges Colton and Williamson, parties should arrange a telephonic appearance through Court Solutions (www.court-solutions.com). For Judges Delano, Funk, Jackson, Jennemann, McEwen, and Vaughan, parties should arrange a telephonic appearance through Court Call (866-582-6878). Failure to comply with the noticing instructions will result in cancellation of the hearing that addresses this specific matter. Related [+]. (Dkt)
Related: [-] 31
Friday, August 21, 2020
31 31 motion Motion for Contempt Fri 08/21 2:48 PM
Memorandum in Support of Motion For Contempt and for Show Cause Order Filed by Angela M Reimer on behalf of Plaintiff The Turin Aviation Group, LLC Related [+] Modified on 8/24/2020 (Bonilla, Adrienne)
Related: [-] imer, Angela
Wednesday, August 19, 2020
30 30 order Substitution of Counsel Wed 08/19 11:31 AM
Order Granting Motion for Substitution of Counsel,. Angela C. Mason-Reimer and AMR Law Firm, PA Substituted for Alberto F. Gomez, Jr., Garrison M. Cohen and Johnson Pope Bokor Ruppel & Burns, LLP as Attorney for the Plaintiff, The Turin Aviation Group, LLC Related [+]. Service Instructions: Garrison Cohen is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Nita)
Related: [-] 29
Thursday, August 13, 2020
29 29 motion Motion for Substitution of Counsel Thu 08/13 3:25 PM
Amended Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Angela C. Mason-Reimer and AMR Law Firm, PA Substituted for Alberto F. Gomez, Jr., Garrison M. Cohen and Johnson Pope Bokor Ruppel & Burns, LLP as Attorney for the Plaintiff, The Turin Aviation Group, LLC . Filed by Garrison Michael Cohen on behalf of Plaintiff The Turin Aviation Group, LLC Related [+]. (Cohen, Garrison)
Related: [-] 27
28 28 order Substitution of Counsel Thu 08/13 2:35 PM
Order Abating Motion for Substitution of Counsel,. Related [+]. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Tonya)
Related: [-] 27
Wednesday, August 12, 2020
27 27 motion Motion for Substitution of Counsel Wed 08/12 3:06 PM
Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Angela C. Mason-Reimer and AMR Law Firm, PA Substituted for Alberto F. Gomez, Jr., Garrison M. Cohen and Johnson Pope Bokor Ruppel & Burns, LLP as Attorney for the Plaintiff, The Turin Aviation Group, LLC . Filed by Garrison Michael Cohen on behalf of Plaintiff The Turin Aviation Group, LLC. (Cohen, Garrison)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 25, 2020
court Corrective Entry - Corrective Action Required (SB) Wed 03/25 2:47 PM
ERROR NOTIFICATION to Kevin Comer for filing in the wrong case. NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN BY THE COURT ON THIS FILING, Related [+]. (Cathy P.)
Related: [-] 25
Monday, March 16, 2020
26 26 motion Motion for Summary Judgment Mon 03/16 5:02 PM
Renewed Motion For Summary Judgment on the Issues of Notice of the Sale and Insolvency Filed by Kevin Alan Comer on behalf of Defendant Skyport Holdings Tampa, LLC. (Comer, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Att: 2 Affidavit
Att: 3 Affidavit
Att: 4 Affidavit
Att: 5 Affidavit
25 25 misc Supplement Mon 03/16 4:52 PM
Supplement to Brief on Lien Sale and Credit Bid Issues Filed by Kevin Alan Comer on behalf of Defendant Skyport Holdings Tampa, LLC Related [+]. (Comer, Kevin)
Related: [-] 14
Monday, December 16, 2019
24 24 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 12/16 8:48 AM
Order Denying Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by the Defendant as moot; The Court finds in favor of Plaintiff on Count I of the complaint and hereby grants summary judgment in favor of Plaintiff; the Court shall enter a separate judgment on Count I Related [+]. Service Instructions: Garrison Cohen is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Dana B.)
Related: [-] 14
misc Electronic Service Text Entry (TEXT ONLY) Mon 12/16 11:38 AM
Service completed via CM/ECF electronic notification. Filed by Garrison Michael Cohen on behalf of Plaintiff The Turin Aviation Group, LLC Related [+]. (Cohen, Garrison)
Related: [-] 24
Wednesday, July 24, 2019
23 23 misc Supplement Wed 07/24 10:53 PM
Supplement to Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Kevin Alan Comer on behalf of Defendant Skyport Holdings Tampa, LLC Related [+]. (Comer, Kevin)
Related: [-] 14
22 22 notice Notice Of Filing Wed 07/24 4:20 PM
Notice of Filing Legislative History in Opposition to Def's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Garrison Michael Cohen on behalf of Plaintiff The Turin Aviation Group, LLC Related [+].(Cohen, Garrison)
Related: [-] 21
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
Att: 3 Exhibit
Att: 4 Exhibit
Att: 5 Exhibit
Att: 6 Exhibit
Att: 7 Exhibit
21 21 9 pgs misc Memorandum Wed 07/24 4:03 PM
Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Pltf's Response in Opposition to Skyport's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Garrison Michael Cohen on behalf of Plaintiff The Turin Aviation Group, LLC. (Cohen, Garrison)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2019
20 20 order Preliminary Injunction Tue 07/09 1:03 PM
Agreed Order Denying Motion For Preliminary Injunction Related [+]. Service Instructions: Alberto Gomez is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Brenton)
Related: [-] 2
misc Electronic Service Text Entry (TEXT ONLY) Tue 07/09 1:33 PM
Service completed via CM/ECF electronic notification. Filed by Alberto F Gomez Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff The Turin Aviation Group, LLC Related [+]. (Gomez, Alberto)
Related: [-] 20
Monday, June 24, 2019
19 19 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Tue 06/25 8:26 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: AL GOMEZ; GARRISON COHEN; KEVIN COMER - CC.. RULING: 1-Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Contains negative notice. Filed by Kevin Alan Comer on behalf of Defendant Skyport Holdings Tampa, LLC Related [+]. (Comer, Kevin) Doc #14; Resp 15).. 30 DAYS TO SUBMIT CASE LAW; UNDER ADVISEMENT.. 2-FURTHER HEARING ON Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction Filed by Alberto F Gomez Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff The Turin Aviation Group, LLC. (Doc #2).. TERMINATED AND COURT NOT EXTENDING INJUNCTION..ORDER BY GOMEZ.. . Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, May 16, 2019
18 18 court Notice Of Deficient Filing Thu 05/16 9:48 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing. Statement of Corporate Ownership not fled Related [+]. Compliance required no later than 6/3/2019. (Susan M.)
Related: [-] 9
Monday, April 29, 2019
17 17 notice Notice Of Hearing Mon 04/29 3:50 PM
Notice of Hearing Filed by Kevin Alan Comer on behalf of Defendant Skyport Holdings Tampa, LLC Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 6/24/2019 at 11:00 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Comer, Kevin)
Related: [-] 14
Wednesday, April 24, 2019
16 16 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Wed 04/24 5:30 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: AL GOMEZ; KEVIN COMER; JON COATS; NATHAN WHEATLEY.. RULING: FURTHER HEARING ON Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction Filed by Alberto F Gomez Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff The Turin Aviation Group, LLC. (Doc #2).. CONT TO 6/24/19 AT 11:00 AM;... ANNOUNCED IN OPEN COURT NO FURTHER NOTICE GIVEN ... . Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-]
court Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only Wed 04/24 3:49 PM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 6/24/2019 11:00 am Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Re: Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Contains negative notice. Doc [14; Resp 15)]. This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions: Kevin Alan Comer is directed to prepare, file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. Failure to comply with the noticing instructions will result in cancellation of the hearing that addresses this specific matter. Related [+]. (Dkt)
Related: [-] 14
Tuesday, April 23, 2019
15 15 answer Response Tue 04/23 3:45 PM
Response to in Opposition to Defendant Skyport's Motion to Dismiss Adversary Complaint Filed by Alberto F Gomez Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff The Turin Aviation Group, LLC Related [+]. (Gomez, Alberto)
Related: [-] 14
Friday, April 12, 2019
14 14 motion Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 04/12 3:39 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Contains negative notice. Filed by Kevin Alan Comer on behalf of Defendant Skyport Holdings Tampa, LLC Related [+]. (Comer, Kevin)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, March 22, 2019
13 13 misc Proof of Service Fri 03/22 2:51 PM
Proof of Service of Agreed Order Granting Debtors Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. No. 12). Filed by Alberto F Gomez Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff The Turin Aviation Group, LLC Related [+]. (Gomez, Alberto)
Related: [-] 12
12 12 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Fri 03/22 9:53 AM
Agreed Order Granting Debtor's Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 4/24/2019 at 10:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Service Instructions: Alberto Gomez is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Pamella)
Related: [-] 2
Monday, March 18, 2019
11 11 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Tue 03/19 6:31 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: AL GOMEZ; JOHN COATS; KEVIN COMER; ED FRANCO; SARAH GILBREATH; MR. OCHALEK.. RULING: Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction Filed by Alberto F Gomez Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff The Turin Aviation Group, LLC. (Doc #2).. GRANTED BY AGREEMENT AS ANNOUNCED ON THE RECORD; FURTHER HEARING 4/24/19 AT 10:30 AM..ORDER BY GOMEZ...MOTION TO SELL TO BE FILED AND HEARD ON 4/24/19 AT 10:30 AM... Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Response Mon 03/18 11:19 AM
Response to Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction Filed by Kevin Alan Comer on behalf of Defendant Skyport Holdings Tampa, LLC Related [+]. (Comer, Kevin)
Related: [-] 2
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
Att: 3 Exhibit
Friday, March 15, 2019
9 9 notice Notice Of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 03/15 12:53 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Kevin Alan Comer on behalf of Defendant Skyport Holdings Tampa, LLC. (Comer, Kevin)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Fri 03/15 12:11 PM
Supplemental Certificate of Service Re: Service of Complaint; Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Notice of Hearing Filed by Alberto F Gomez Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff The Turin Aviation Group, LLC Related [+]. (Gomez, Alberto)
Related: [-] 6 ,1 ,2
Thursday, March 14, 2019
7 7 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Thu 03/14 4:12 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Alberto F Gomez Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff The Turin Aviation Group, LLC. (Gomez, Alberto)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
6 6 notice Notice Of Hearing Wed 03/13 4:07 PM
Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction Filed by Alberto F Gomez Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff The Turin Aviation Group, LLC Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 3/18/2019 at 01:45 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Gomez, Alberto)
Related: [-] 2
5 5 misc Summons Service Executed Wed 03/13 3:28 PM
Service Executed on Skyport Holdings Tampa, LLC; Hawk Aircraft Services, LLC and Christopher Nocco, Pasco County Sheriff of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Alberto F Gomez Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff The Turin Aviation Group, LLC Related [+]. (Gomez, Alberto)
Related: [-] 4 ,1 ,2
4 4 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 03/13 11:59 AM
Summons issued on Skyport Holdings Tampa, LLC, Hawk Aircraft Services, LLC, Christopher Nocco, Pasco County Sheriff along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 04/12/2019. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
court Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only Wed 03/13 1:27 PM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 3/18/2019 1:45 pm Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Re: Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction Doc2 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions: Alberto F Gomez is directed to prepare, file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. Failure to comply with the noticing instructions will result in cancellation of the hearing that addresses this specific matter. Related [+]. (Dkt)
Related: [-] 2
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
3 3 misc Certificate of Necessity Tue 03/12 5:05 PM
Certificate of Necessity Filed by Alberto F Gomez Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff The Turin Aviation Group, LLC Related [+]. (Gomez, Alberto)
Related: [-] 2
2 2 motion Motion for Preliminary Injunction Tue 03/12 5:01 PM
Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction Filed by Alberto F Gomez Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff The Turin Aviation Group, LLC. (Gomez, Alberto)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
1 1 cmp Complaint - Original Tue 03/12 4:47 PM
Complaint by The Turin Aviation Group, LLC against Skyport Holdings Tampa, LLC, Hawk Aircraft Services, LLC, Christopher Nocco, Pasco County Sheriff. Filing Fee Not Required. Nature of Suit: [21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)],[11 Related [+]],[71 (Injunctive relief - reinstatement of stay)]. (Gomez, Alberto)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 542 turnover of property
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit B