California Central District Court
Judge:Dale S Fischer
Referred: Autumn D Spaeth
Case #: 2:19-cv-01838
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2019

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, July 15, 2019
6 6 misc Declaration Tue 2:11 PM
DECLARATION to Explain Violations of Filing Time Limits re Order to Show Cause5 filed by Petitioner John C. Russell. (kh)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2019
5 5 6 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 4:17 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: Petitioner is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE within twenty-eight (28) days of the service of this Order why the Court should not dismiss this action as time-barred and address whether Ground Five should be dismissed as moot. In the alternative, Petitioner may request a voluntary dismissal of this action without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a). However, Petitioner is advised that any dismissed claims may be later subject to the statute of limitations under 28 U.S.C. 2244(d)(1). Response to Order to Show Cause due by 7/29/2019. (kh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2019
4 4 misc Financial Entry Wed 10:05 AM
FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $5.00 filing fee from John C. Russell. Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254)1 . Receipt number LA187708. (ek)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
3 3 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-84) (Habeas) - optional html form Wed 12:22 PM
NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Dale S. Fischer and referred to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (esa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV 111
2 2 misc Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate - DECLINED by Party Wed 12:21 PM
ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c filed by petitioner John C. Russell. The petitioner does not consent. (esa)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) Wed 12:20 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer and referred to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth, (Filing fee $ 5 due), filed by petitioner John C. Russell. (esa)
Related: [-]