California Central District Court
Judge:Andre Birotte Jr
Referred: Gail J Standish
Case #: 2:19-cv-01896
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2019
Terminated:May 15, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Apr 28, 2019 2:53 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
VOC Realty Investments Inc.
Represented By
Matthew Joseph Marino
Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory And Natsis LLP
contact info
Defendant
Waves of Smiles Dentistry
Plaintiff
Mel Kleinman
Represented By
Timothy George McFarlin
Mcfarlin LLP
contact info
Jarrod Yutaka Nakano
Mcfarlin LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, May 15, 2019
15 15 order Dismissing Case Wed 4:31 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL ACTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: THE COURT having been advised by counsel that the action has been settled14 ; IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this action is hereby dismissed without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within 60 days, to re-open the action if settlement is not consummated. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) (gk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2019
14 14 notice Settlement Tue 8:27 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Mel Kleinman. (Nakano, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 11:57 AM
MINUTE ORDER [In Chambers] Order To Show Cause Regarding Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff(s) to show cause, in writing, on or before May 28, 2019 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for submission without oral argument. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of Plaintiff(s) response. Failure to respond to this Order to Show Cause will be deemed consent to the dismissal of the action. (lom)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2019
12 12 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 8:25 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to VOC Realty Investments Inc. answer now due 5/13/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant VOC Realty Investments Inc..(Attorney Matthew Joseph Marino added to party VOC Realty Investments Inc.(pty:dft))(Marino, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2019
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 11:25 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mel Kleinman, upon Defendant Waves of Smiles Dentistry served on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendants in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Nakano, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2019
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 8:20 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
Related: [-]
9 9 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Fri 8:19 AM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (cb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2019
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 4:04 PM
21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint1 as to defendants VOC Realty Investments Inc., Waves of Smiles Dentistry. (esa)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 3:48 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 3:48 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (esa)
Related: [-]
5 5 transfer Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form Thu 3:29 PM
NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Western Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Gail J. Standish. New Case Number 2:19-cv-01896 AB (GJSx). (esa)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 1:40 PM
Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Mel Kleinman, (Nakano, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Thu 1:38 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Mel Kleinman. (Nakano, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 12:36 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mel Kleinman. (Nakano, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 12:34 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23374792 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Mel Kleinman. (Attorney Jarrod Yutaka Nakano added to party Mel Kleinman(pty:pla))(Nakano, Jarrod)
Related: [-]