California Central District Court
Judge:James V Selna
Referred: John D Early
Case #: 8:19-cv-00502
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2019
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2019 1:28 AM PDT
Defendant
Shell Fuels #68594
Defendant
TESORO SOUTH COAST COMPANY, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company
Plaintiff
Mel Kleinman
Represented By
Jarrod Yutaka Nakano
Mcfarlin LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, March 22, 2019
9 9 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 9:35 AM
OOrder Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for June 17, 2019 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by June 10, 2019. (lb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2019
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 7:59 AM
INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2019
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 12:07 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Shell Fuels No. 68594, Tesoro South Coast Company, LLC. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 11:59 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 11:59 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2019
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 9:32 AM
Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mel Kleinman, (Nakano, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 9:32 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mel Kleinman. (Nakano, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Thu 9:31 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Mel Kleinman. (Nakano, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 9:30 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23372679 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Mel Kleinman. (Attorney Jarrod Yutaka Nakano added to party Mel Kleinman(pty:pla))(Nakano, Jarrod)
Related: [-]