Rosemarie Vadillo v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen V Wilson |
Referred: | Jacqueline Chooljian |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-01954 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2019 |
Terminated: | Aug 09, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 11, 2019 1:56 AM PDT |
Defendant
Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosemarie Vadillo
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, August 09, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
stip
Dismiss Case
Fri 08/09 11:33 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by defendant Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston.(Nalty, Sean) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Wed 07/03 2:25 PM
CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) |
|
15 | 15
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 07/03 2:23 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE/IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The initial status conference set for July 8, 2019 at 3:00 p.m.14 is vacated and off-calendar. The Court sets a Court Trial for October 15, 2019 at 9:00 a.m., with a Pretrial Conference on October 7, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. The parties are directed to file simultaneous trial briefs on August 30, 2019, and the parties may file simultaneous responsive trial briefs on September 9, 2019. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) |
|
Friday, May 31, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Fri 05/31 1:54 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 7/8/2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) |
|
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 05/31 11:19 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston.(Nalty, Sean) |
|
Tuesday, May 07, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Tue 05/07 1:58 PM
ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days),11 . Having reviewed the stipulation of the parties, and good cause shown, the Court grants defendant's request for an extension to May 31, 2019 to answer the complaint in this matter. (mrgo) |
|
Friday, May 03, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Fri 05/03 5:06 PM
Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to May 31, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston.(Nalty, Sean) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order to Exend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint | ||
Wednesday, April 03, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 04/03 7:40 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, identifying The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company; Lincoln National Corporation. (Nalty, Sean) |
|
9 | 9
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Wed 04/03 7:38 AM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston answer now due 5/10/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston.(Attorney Sean P Nalty added to party Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston(pty:dft))(Nalty, Sean) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Thu 03/21 10:04 AM
NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/19 12:12 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (et) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/19 12:00 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/19 12:00 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/15 3:40 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Rosemarie Vadillo. (Keehn, Robert) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/15 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Rosemarie Vadillo, (Keehn, Robert) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/15 3:37 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Rosemarie Vadillo. (Keehn, Robert) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/15 3:36 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23385048 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Rosemarie Vadillo. (Attorney Robert F Keehn added to party Rosemarie Vadillo(pty:pla))(Keehn, Robert) |