Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 68.41.165.219
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Victoria A Roberts |
Referred: | Anthony P Patti |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-10798 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 27, 2019 |
Last checked: Friday Sep 13, 2019 4:58 AM EDT |
Defendant
John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 68.41.165.219
|
|
Plaintiff
Malibu Media, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, July 15, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Patent/Copyright/Trademark Report
Mon 07/15 11:23 AM
Copyright Report Sent To Washington (SSch) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Dismissing Case
Thu 06/27 1:41 PM
ORDER of Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer) |
|
Monday, June 17, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 06/17 4:45 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Malibu Media, LLC without prejudice (Bernier, Joel) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion - Free
Thu 04/04 8:17 PM
ORDER Granting2 Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference.. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2019 | ||
notice
Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option
Mon 03/18 11:50 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (DWor) |
||
Sunday, March 17, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Patent/Copyright/Trademark Report
Sun 03/17 2:28 PM
Copyright Report Sent To Washington (Bernier, Joel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
3 | 3
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Sun 03/17 2:24 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Malibu Media, LLC (Bernier, Joel) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Motion - Free
Sun 03/17 2:21 PM
MOTION leave to serve a third party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Malibu Media, LLC. (Bernier, Joel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Colette Pelissier, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit P..Paige Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration of Tobias Fieser | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Civil Case - Complaint
Sun 03/17 2:14 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Malibu Media, LLC against John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 68.41.165.219 with Jury Demand. No summons requested. Receipt No: 0645-7155570 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Los Angeles - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Bernier, Joel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B |