Cohan v. Arapahoe Development LLC
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | R Brooke Jackson |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-00792 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12181 American With Disabilities Act (ADA) |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2019 |
Terminated: | Aug 23, 2019 |
Last checked: Friday Sep 13, 2019 2:46 AM MDT |
Defendant
Arapahoe Development LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Howard Cohan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Friday, August 23, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
utility
Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC
Fri 08/23 10:45 AM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal filed in this case on 8/23/19. Text Only Entry (jdyne, ) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case
Fri 08/23 8:43 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Howard Cohan (Saad, Gloria) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
order
Minute Order
Tue 07/23 1:44 PM
MINUTE ORDER re:16 Notice of Settlement filed by Howard Cohan. The Court request that the parties submit a Dismissal Paper by 8/23/2019. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/23/19. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Settlement
Mon 07/22 6:45 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiff Howard Cohan (Blackmore, George) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Mon 07/22 6:44 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by George Thomas Blackmore on behalf of Howard CohanAttorney George Thomas Blackmore added to party Howard Cohan(pty:pla) (Blackmore, George) |
|
Friday, July 05, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond
Fri 07/05 9:40 AM
ORDER granting13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Arapahoe Development LLC's answer is due 07/22/2019. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/5/19. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. ) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond
Wed 07/03 4:39 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re1 Complaint, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Defendant Arapahoe Development LLC. (Stone, Lawrence) |
|
Monday, May 13, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Advisory Document Noncompliance
Mon 05/13 8:05 AM
ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re:10 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Lawrence Daniel Stone.The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (dkals, ) |
|
Friday, May 10, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
service
Waiver of Return of Service - Executed - Complaint
Fri 05/10 5:07 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Arapahoe Development LLC. Arapahoe Development LLC waiver sent on 5/8/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Stone, Lawrence) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Fri 05/10 4:55 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lawrence Daniel Stone on behalf of Arapahoe Development LLC (Stone, Lawrence) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion to Quash
Wed 05/01 8:00 AM
ORDER granting8 MOTION to Quash Service of Process Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(5). By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/1/19. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. ) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Quash
Mon 04/29 5:59 PM
MOTION to Quash Service of Process Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(5) by Defendant Arapahoe Development LLC.(Stone, Lawrence) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) | ||
Thursday, April 11, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint
Thu 04/11 10:06 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Howard Cohan. Arapahoe Development LLC served on 4/7/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Saad, Gloria) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 03/18 1:31 PM
ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/18/19. (rbjsec. ) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Letter Reassigning Case
Mon 03/18 12:52 PM
CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to4 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00792-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (ktera) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
misc
Memorandum Returning Case
Mon 03/18 12:48 PM
MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE for reassignment by Judge Richard P. Matsch. (ktera) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Summons Issued
Mon 03/18 10:06 AM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (agarc, ) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form | ||
Sunday, March 17, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Mon 03/18 10:06 AM
Case assigned to Judge Richard P. Matsch and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (agarc, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sun 03/17 9:13 PM
COMPLAINT against Arapahoe Development LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6585150)Attorney Gloria Yacoub Saad added to party Howard Cohan(pty:pla), filed by Howard Cohan.(Saad, Gloria) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |