Jane Doe # 1 et al v. Jetblue Airways Corporation et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Nicholas G Garaufis |
Referred: | Cheryl L Pollak |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-01542 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2003 Job Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2019 |
Terminated: | Aug 19, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 14, 2019 5:30 AM EDT |
Defendant
Jetblue Airways Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Eric Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Dan Watson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe # 1
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe # 2
|
Represented By
|
1. | A Lawsuit Against JetBlue Says Pilots Drugged and Raped Flight Attendants (thepointsguy.com) |
Submitted Sat 03/23/2019 | |
2. | Lawsuit contends JetBlue pilot drugged three crew members, raped two (usatoday.com) |
Submitted Fri 03/22/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 01, 2020 | ||
utility
Transfer Case Opened
Tue 09/01 8:46 AM
CASE: 1:19-cv-01542 DETAILS: Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in District of Massachusetts as case 1:20-cv-11623, filed 08/31/2020. (Marziliano, August) |
||
Monday, August 31, 2020 | ||
utility
Transfer Case Opened
Mon 08/31 3:41 PM
Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in District of Massachusetts as case 1:20-cv-11623, filed 08/31/2020. (Lee, Tiffeny) |
||
Wednesday, August 19, 2020 | ||
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Transfer
Wed 08/19 10:40 AM
Case transferred to District of Massachusetts. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent via CM/ECF. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Lee, Tiffeny) |
||
Tuesday, August 11, 2020 | ||
37 | 37
15
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 08/11 2:31 PM
MEMORANDUM & ORDER, For the reasons stated above, the court transfers this case to the District of Massachusetts and defers decision on Defendants' motionsto dismiss to the transferee court. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.1, the Clerk of Court is respectfully DIRECTED, after seven days, to effectuate the transfer of the case to the District of Massachusetts. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 8/11/2020. (case to be transferred after seven (7) days) (Lee, Tiffeny) |
|
Monday, July 06, 2020 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Change of Address/Firm/Email
Mon 07/06 12:23 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address Once the filing has been made, you must login to www.pacer.gov and update your account. (Steinberg, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, November 27, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 11/27 3:38 PM
Fully Briefed MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to Daniel Watson , Fully Briefed MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Daniel Watson by Dan Watson. (Rodriguez, Max) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Watson's Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration in Support of Watson's Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 3 Memorandum in Opposition to Watson's Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 4 Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Watson's Motion to Dismiss | ||
34 | 34
motion
Dismiss
Wed 11/27 3:17 PM
Fully Briefed MOTION to Dismiss for improper venue or for failure to state a claim as against JetBlue by Jetblue Airways Corporation. (Abeysekera, Samantha) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibits A-G to JetBlue's Memorandum of Law in Support, | ||
Att: 3 Memorandum in Opposition, | ||
Att: 4 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of JetBlue's Motion to Dismiss | ||
33 | 33
respoth
Reply in Support
Wed 11/27 12:34 PM
REPLY in Support re30 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Eric Johnson. (Hugel, Paul) |
|
32 | 32
30+
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Opposition
Wed 11/27 12:32 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re30 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Eric Johnson. (Hugel, Paul) |
|
31 | 31
15
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Wed 11/27 12:29 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re30 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Eric Johnson. (Hugel, Paul) |
|
30 | 30
motion
Dismiss
Wed 11/27 12:27 PM
MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Eric Johnson. (Hugel, Paul) |
|
Monday, November 18, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Mon 11/18 9:27 AM
ORDER granting27 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 11/15/2019. (Lee, Tiffeny) |
|
Friday, November 15, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
motion
File Excess Pages
Fri 11/15 12:23 AM
Supplemental MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Jane Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2. (Altaras, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, November 14, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
motion
File Excess Pages
Thu 11/14 4:22 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Jane Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2. (Altaras, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, October 24, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Thu 10/24 2:07 PM
ORDER granting25 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 10/23/2019. (Lee, Tiffeny) |
|
Wednesday, October 23, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
motion
File Excess Pages
Wed 10/23 12:58 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Jetblue Airways Corporation. (Abeysekera, Samantha) |
|
Wednesday, October 09, 2019 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 10/09 9:43 AM
ORDER re: Defendants JetBlue Airways Corporation's22 and Eric Johnson's23 Applications for a Pre-Motion Conference: The Applications are DENIED as unnecessary. All Defendants shall serve their motions to dismiss the amended complaint by no later than October 25, 2019; Plaintiffs shall serve their response(s) by no later than November 15, 2019; and Defendants shall serve their replies, if any, and file the fully briefed motions by no later than November 27, 2019. All Defendants' time to answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint is extended until 14 days following the order deciding their anticipated motions. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 10/9/2019. (Davis, Eleanor) |
||
Tuesday, October 08, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Letter
Tue 10/08 5:57 PM
Letter re Proposed Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Dan Watson (Rodriguez, Max) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Pre Motion Conference
Tue 10/08 4:31 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re20 Amended Complaint In Anticipation of Filing a Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, Or, In the Alternative, To Transfer Venue for the Convenience of the Parties and Witnesses; or, In the Alternative, to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jetblue Airways Corporation. (Abeysekera, Samantha) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Defendants Counsel Joint Letter to Plaintiffs Counsel dated July 31, 2019, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Transcript of June 25, 2019 Pre-Motion Court Conference | ||
22 | 22
motion
Pre Motion Conference
Tue 10/08 4:26 PM
MOTION for pre motion conference re Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Eric Johnson. (Hugel, Paul) |
|
Tuesday, September 24, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
3
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Opposition
Tue 09/24 11:15 AM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Jane Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2. (Altaras, Daniel) |
|
20 | 20
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 09/24 11:06 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jetblue Airways Corporation, Eric Johnson, Dan Watson, filed by Jane Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2. (Altaras, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 09/03 4:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Max Ephraim Rodriguez on behalf of Dan Watson (aty to be noticed) (Rodriguez, Max) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 09/03 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Foti on behalf of Dan Watson (aty to be noticed) (Foti, Catherine) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Wed 08/28 9:22 AM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 8/27/2019. (Marziliano, August) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
motion
File Excess Pages
Tue 08/27 11:50 AM
Letter MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Jetblue Airways Corporation. (Abeysekera, Samantha) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2019 | ||
minutes
Pre Motion Conference
Mon 07/01 10:46 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis: Pre-Motion Conference held on 6/25/2019. Counsel for all parties present. The court granted Defendants leave to move to dismiss the complaint and set the following briefing schedule: Defendants shall serve their motions by no later than September 16, 2019; Plaintiffs shall serve their response(s) by no later than October 4, 2019; and Defendants shall serve their replies, if any, and file the fully briefed motions by no later than October 25, 2019. (Court Reporter Holly Driscoll) (Davis, Eleanor) |
||
Monday, June 24, 2019 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 06/24 10:36 AM
ORDER re: Defendant Dan Watson's15 Request for a Pre-Motion conference: The Request is GRANTED. Counsel for Mr. Watson shall attend the conference scheduled on June 25, 2019, and the parties should be prepared to discuss his anticipated motion to dismiss. Additionally, Mr. Watson's time to answer or otherwise reply to the complaint is extended until 14 days following the order deciding his anticipated motion. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 6/24/2019. (Davis, Eleanor) |
||
Friday, June 21, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Letter
Fri 06/21 3:57 PM
Letter re proposed Motion to Dismiss by Dan Watson (Foti, Catherine) |
|
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 06/21 10:07 AM
ORDER re: Defendant Eric Johnson's14 Request for a Pre-Motion conference: The Request is GRANTED. Counsel for Mr. Johnson shall attend the conference scheduled on June 25, 2019, and the parties should be prepared to discuss his anticipated motion to dismiss. Additionally, Mr. Johnson's time to answer or otherwise reply to the complaint is extended until 14 days following the order deciding its anticipated motion. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 6/21/2019. (Davis, Eleanor) |
||
Thursday, June 20, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Thu 06/20 6:05 PM
Letter Requesting Pre-Motion Conference by Eric Johnson (Hugel, Paul) |
|
Tuesday, June 11, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 06/11 7:33 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jane Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2. Dan Watson waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Melamed, Abraham) |
|
Sunday, June 02, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Sun 06/02 1:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Judah Altaras on behalf of Jane Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2 (aty to be noticed) (Altaras, Daniel) |
|
Friday, May 31, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 05/31 12:37 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jane Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2. Eric Johnson waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Melamed, Abraham) |
|
Thursday, May 09, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
Thu 05/09 9:41 AM
ORDER re: Defendant JetBlue Airways Corporation's ("JetBlue")8 Application for a Pre-Motion Conference: The Application is GRANTED. JetBlue is DIRECTED to confer with Plaintiffs and contact the court's Deputy at 718-613-2545 to schedule the pre-motion conference. Counsel for the other Defendants may, but are not required to, attend the pre-motion conference. JetBlue should be prepared to discuss all potential grounds for dismissal. Additionally, JetBlue's time to answer or otherwise reply to the complaint is extended until 14 days following the order deciding its anticipated motion. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 5/8/2019. (Davis, Eleanor) |
||
Monday, May 06, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 05/06 5:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Adam Steinberg on behalf of Jetblue Airways Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Steinberg, Matthew) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 05/06 5:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond Joseph Berti on behalf of Jetblue Airways Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Berti, Raymond) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Pre Motion Conference
Mon 05/06 5:43 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference In Anticipation of Filing a Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, Or, in the Alternative, To Transfer Venue for the Convenience of the Parties and Witnesses by Jetblue Airways Corporation. (Abeysekera, Samantha) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 05/06 5:39 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jetblue Airways Corporation (Abeysekera, Samantha) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 05/06 5:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha K. Abeysekera on behalf of Jetblue Airways Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Abeysekera, Samantha) |
|
Thursday, May 02, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 05/02 12:11 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jane Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2. Jetblue Airways Corporation waiver sent on 4/1/2019, answer due 5/31/2019. (Melamed, Abraham) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/19 3:02 PM
Summons Issued as to Jetblue Airways Corporation, Eric Johnson, Dan Watson. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
Att: 1 Summon, | ||
Att: 2 Summon | ||
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 03/19 2:53 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 03/19 2:52 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 03/19 2:52 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Monday, March 18, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
24
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/18 8:28 PM
COMPLAINT against Jetblue Airways Corporation, Eric Johnson, Dan Watson filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11295079 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Jane Doe # 1, Jane Doe # 2. (Melamed, Abraham) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons |