Molson Coors Beverage Company USA, LLC v. Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC
Wisconsin Western District Court | |
Judge: | William M Conley |
Referred: | Stephen L Crocker |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-00218 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 31, 2022 |
Case in other court: | 19-02200 19-02713 19-02782 19-03097 Seventh Circuit, 19-03116 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 17, 2019 3:40 AM CDT |
Defendant
Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Millercoors, LLC
|
Represented By
|
1. | MillerCoors Sues Anheuser-Busch Over Bud Light's Corn Syrup Ads (wsj.com) |
Submitted Fri 03/22/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM CDT |