Ryan Kavanaugh v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Otis D Wright, II |
Referred: | Suzanne H Segal |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-02145 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2019 |
Terminated: | Aug 15, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 17, 2019 1:30 AM PDT |
Defendant
Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Management Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Great American Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chelsea Laing
|
|
Defendant
National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Ryan Kavanaugh
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 10, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Receipt
Wed 09/11 2:02 PM
Receipt of remand by Los Angeles County Superior Court on 8/19/19 (lc) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2019 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form
Thu 08/15 2:23 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court No.19STCV02868 (lc) |
|
38 | 38
order
Remand Case to State Court
Thu 08/15 2:20 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REMAND11 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Case remanded to Los Angeles Superior Court, No.19STCV02868. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (lc) .Modified on 8/15/2019 (lc) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)
Wed 07/03 10:47 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. (lc) |
|
36 | 36
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 07/03 10:46 AM
SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (JURY TRIALS) by Judge Otis D Wright II: THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IS VACATED. SEE THE LAST PAGE OF THIS ORDER FOR THE SPECIFIED DATES. Jury trial: 8/11/20 9:00 AM; File final trial exhibit stipulation: 8/6/20 ; hearing on motions in limine: 7/27/20 1:30 PM; Deadline to file oppositions to motions in limine: 7/20/20; Final Pretrial Conference: 7/13/20 1:30 PM; file motions in limine: 7/13/20; deadline to File Proposed Pretrial Conference Order, Memoranda and Contentions of Fact and Law, Joint Witness List, Joint Exhibit List and Exhibit Stipulation, Proposed Verdict Form(s), Proposed Jury Instructions / Disputed Jury Instructions, Proposed Voir Dire Questions, Joint Statement of the Case, Joint Status Report re: Settlement: 7/6/20; Deadline for hearing motions:5/18/20; Deadline to conduct settlement conference: 4/27/20; expert discovery cutoff: 4/6/20; percipient/fact discovery cutoff: 3/16/20; last date to amend pleadings or add parties:9/30/19. (lc) |
|
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Tue 07/02 10:39 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Yvonne M Schulte counsel for Defendant Great American Insurance Company. Adding Yvonne M. Schulte as counsel of record for Great American Insurance Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Great American Insurance Company. (Attorney Yvonne M Schulte added to party Great American Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Schulte, Yvonne) |
|
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Tue 07/02 10:06 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Susan Koehler Sullivan counsel for Defendant Great American Insurance Company. Adding Yvonne M. Schulte as counsel of record for Great American Insurance Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Great American Insurance Company. (Sullivan, Susan) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Mon 07/01 2:55 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10 days, filed by Plaintiff Ryan Kavanaugh.. (Myers, Nicholas) |
|
Tuesday, May 21, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 05/21 2:49 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Great American Insurance Company, identifying American Financial Group, Inc.. (Sullivan, Susan) |
|
Wednesday, May 08, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Wed 05/08 9:01 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery)29 by Great American Insurance Company. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) |
|
30 | 30
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 05/08 9:00 AM
The hearing on the MOTION TO REMAND11 , scheduled for May 13, 2019 at 1:30 P.M., is hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matter stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) |
|
Tuesday, May 07, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Tue 05/07 2:53 PM
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), with JURY DEMAND Defendant Great American Insurance Company's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Great American Insurance Company.(Sullivan, Susan) |
|
Friday, May 03, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 05/03 11:31 AM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, identifying Ryan Kavanaugh; National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA; Great American Insurance Company; Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Management Services, Inc.; Chelsea Laing; AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc.; AIG Property Casualty, Inc.; and American International Group, Inc.. (Glavinovich, Mikel) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
attorney
Change of Address
Wed 05/01 10:16 AM
NOTICE of Change of address by Brett Charles Safford attorney for Defendant Great American Insurance Company. Changing attorneys address to 355 South Grand Avenue, Suite 1400, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Filed by Defendant Great American Insurance Company. (Safford, Brett) |
|
26 | 26
attorney
Change of Address
Wed 05/01 10:05 AM
NOTICE of Change of address by Gretchen S Carner attorney for Defendant Great American Insurance Company. Changing attorneys address to 355 South Grand Avenue, Suite 1400, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Filed by Defendant Great American Insurance Company. (Carner, Gretchen) |
|
25 | 25
attorney
Change of Address
Wed 05/01 10:02 AM
NOTICE of Change of address by Susan Koehler Sullivan attorney for Defendant Great American Insurance Company. Changing attorneys address to 355 South Grand Avenue, Suite 1400, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Filed by Defendant Great American Insurance Company. (Sullivan, Susan) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
6
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 04/23 3:42 PM
ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for 7/8/19 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc) |
|
23 | 23
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Tue 04/23 3:39 PM
ORDER ON SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT TO MAY 7,201919 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Errata
Tue 04/23 11:15 AM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Ryan Kavanaugh. correcting Reply (Motion related)21 (Haffner, Joshua) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 04/22 1:22 PM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court11 filed by Plaintiff Ryan Kavanaugh. (Haffner, Joshua) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Mon 04/22 11:57 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery)18 by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) |
|
19 | 19
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Mon 04/22 11:15 AM
Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to May 7, 2019 filed by Defendant Great American Insurance Company.(Sullivan, Susan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 19, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Fri 04/19 11:54 AM
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.(Glavinovich, Mikel) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Tue 04/16 2:23 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc) |
|
16 | 16
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 04/16 7:23 AM
COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED, the Motion to Remand11 is CONTINUED to May 13, 2019 at 1:30 p.m before Judge Otis D. Wright,II THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
cs_rasgn
Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89)
Mon 04/15 4:52 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-02145 ODW(SSx). (rn) |
|
14 | 14
respm
Declaration (Motion related)
Mon 04/15 1:18 PM
DECLARATION of Leslie A. Blozan In Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court11 filed by Defendant Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Management Services, Inc.. (Dean, Kristi) |
|
13 | 13
8
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Mon 04/15 1:16 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court11 filed by Defendant Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Management Services, Inc.. (Dean, Kristi) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Wed 04/10 1:32 PM
ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days),10 , Defendant Great American Insurance Company Answer to Complaint is due 4/29/2019 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew (shb) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Remand Case to State Court
Thu 04/04 1:30 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Ryan Kavanaugh. Motion set for hearing on 5/7/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. (Haffner, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Joshua H. Haffner in Support of Motion to Remand to state court, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 27, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Wed 03/27 3:29 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 04/29/2019 filed by Defendant Great American Insurance Company.(Attorney Susan Koehler Sullivan added to party Great American Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Sullivan, Susan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order on Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant Great American Insurance to Respond to Complaint | ||
9 | 9
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Wed 03/27 12:44 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA answer now due 4/19/2019, filed by Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.(Attorney Mikel A Glavinovich added to party National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA(pty:dft))(Glavinovich, Mikel) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Declaration
Tue 03/26 1:36 PM
DECLARATION of Chelsea Laing re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 In Support of Notice of and Petition for Removal from State Court to Federal Court filed by Defendant Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Management Services, Inc.. (Dean, Kristi) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Declaration
Tue 03/26 1:34 PM
DECLARATION of Steve Wennerstrum re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 In Support of Notice of and Petition for Removal from State Court to Federal Court filed by Defendant Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Management Services, Inc.. (Dean, Kristi) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Declaration
Tue 03/26 1:32 PM
DECLARATION of Leslie A. Blozan re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 In Support of Notice of and Petition for Removal from State Court to Federal Court filed by Defendant Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Management Services, Inc.. (Dean, Kristi) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/22 4:57 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/22 4:57 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (car) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/21 6:41 PM
CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Management Services, Inc., (Dean, Kristi) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/21 6:37 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Management Services, Inc.. (Dean, Kristi) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/21 6:33 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV02868 Receipt No: 0973-23421239 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Management Services, Inc.. (Attorney Kristi Weiler Dean added to party Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Management Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Dean, Kristi) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal to Federal Court, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Notice of Removal to Federal Court, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Notice of Removal to Federal Court | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Fri 03/22 5:01 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Management Services, Inc., Does 1-50, Inclusive, Great American Insurance Company, Chelsea Laing, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Ryan Kavanaugh. Filed in State Court on 1/28/19 Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal1 (car) |