Selensky v. State of Alabama
Alabama Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Callie V S Granade |
Referred: | Katherine P Nelson |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-00062 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 14, 2014 |
Terminated: | Jun 03, 2014 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 08, 2014 9:38 PM CST |
Defendant
State of Alabama
|
|
Plaintiff
Linda Cone Selensky
P. O. Box 7914
Spanish Fort, AL 36577 |
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, June 02, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
appeal
Appeal Remark
Fri 06/10 9:41 AM
Appeal Remark re15 Notice of Appeal : USCA Case Number 14-13193 EE, Letter styled to USCA referring to Appellant's dismissal of her appeal e-mailed to Lois Tunstall, USCA. Paper placed in civil daily 6/2/16. (jal) |
|
Thursday, May 19, 2016 | ||
appeal
Appeal Remark
Fri 05/20 10:01 AM
Appeal Remark re15 Notice of Appeal : USCA Case Number 14-13193 Appellant Selensky provided this court with a document styled to the USCA addressing the dismissal of her appeal. Clerk forwarded same to Lois Tunstall at USCA. Paper filed in civil daily 5/19/16. (jal) |
||
Wednesday, September 02, 2015 | ||
27 | 27
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 09/02 12:30 PM
MANDATE of USCA re:15 Notice of Appeal filed by Linda Cone Selensky Mandate issued 9/2/15 ; USCA Case Number 14-13193 (jal) |
|
Wednesday, July 22, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
appeal
USCA Order
Thu 07/23 10:51 AM
OPINION of USCA as to15 Notice of Appeal filed by Linda Cone Selensky, AFFIRMED. (Mandate to issue at a later date.) (jal) |
|
Monday, February 23, 2015 | ||
appeal
Electronic Availability of ROA
Mon 02/23 8:49 AM
Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Southern District of Alabama certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re:15 Notice of Appeal, Appeal No. 14-13193 E. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (jal) |
||
Wednesday, January 21, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
appeal
USCA Order
Thu 01/22 9:19 AM
ORDER of USCA, APPEAL CLERICALLY REINSTATED because was erroneously dismissed as to the filing fee, fee paid prior to dismissal, as to15 Notice of Appeal filed by Linda Cone Selensky (jal) |
|
Thursday, January 15, 2015 | ||
24 | 24 ENTRY OF DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PAY FILING FEE ISSUED AS MANDATE of USCA Mandate issued 1/15/15 ; USCA Case Number 14-13193 E (jal) | |
Wednesday, December 17, 2014 | ||
23 | 23
appeal
USCA Appeal Fees
Thu 12/18 10:16 AM
USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 33563 re15 Notice of Appeal filed by Linda Cone Selensky ; USCA Case Number 14-13193 E (jal) |
|
Friday, December 05, 2014 | ||
22 | 22
appeal
USCA Order
Mon 12/08 9:25 AM
ORDER of USCA as to15 Notice of Appeal filed by Linda Cone Selensky Denying IFP. (jal) |
|
Wednesday, August 27, 2014 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 08/27 9:33 AM
ORDER finding as moot20 Motion to state reasons for not granting an appeal IFP. The Order denying an IFP appeal (Doc. 19)stated that the reasons were the same as those in the court's opinion finding that the lawsuit was frivolous. (Docs. 3 and 9). Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/27/2014. (Granade, Callie) |
|
Tuesday, August 26, 2014 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 08/26 3:22 PM
MOTION to state the reasons her motion IFP was not granted re19 Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Linda Cone Selensky. Referred to Judge Callie V. S. Granade. (jal) |
|
utility
Motions Referred
Tue 08/26 3:23 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:20 MOTION to state the reasons her motion IFP was not granted re19 Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis Referred to Judge Callie V. S. Granade. (jal) |
||
Thursday, July 31, 2014 | ||
19 | 19 ORDER denying18 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/31/2014. (Copy mailed to Appellant) (jal) | |
Monday, July 28, 2014 | ||
18 | 18 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Linda Cone Selensky. Referred to Judge Callie V. S. Granade. (Forwarded from the USCA). (jal) | |
Wednesday, July 16, 2014 | ||
17 | 17 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re15 Notice of Appeal filed by Linda Cone Selensky. USCA Case Number 14-13193 E (jal) | |
16 | 16 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:15 Notice of Appeal,3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint filed by Linda Cone Selensky,9 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations,10 Judgment, Judge Appealed: Judge Granade, Court Reporter: No Hearings, Fee Paid: Not Paid (jal) | |
Friday, July 11, 2014 | ||
15 | 15 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to10 Judgment by Linda Cone Selensky. (jal) (Forwarded from USCA dated 7/7/14, no hearings). | |
Thursday, June 19, 2014 | ||
14 | 14 ENDORSED ORDER denying13 Motion to Challenge Court Order. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/19/2014. (Granade, Callie) | |
Tuesday, June 17, 2014 | ||
13 | 13 MOTION to Challenge Court Order by Linda Cone Selensky; Referred to Judge Callie V. S. Granade. (mab) | |
Tuesday, June 10, 2014 | ||
12 | 12 ORDER, denying11 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/10/2014. (copy to pltf) (mab) | |
Friday, June 06, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 MOTION for Hearing by Linda Cone Selensky. Referred to Judge Granade. (sdb) | |
Tuesday, June 03, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 JUDGMENT, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that this action is DISMISSED, with prejudice, prior to service for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and as frivolous. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/3/2014. (copy to pltf) (mab) | |
9 | 9 ORDER ADOPTING3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as the opinion of this Court, and DISMISSING action with prejudice prior to service for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/3/2014. (copy to pltf) (mab) | |
Tuesday, May 06, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 NOTICE of Change of Address (to P. O. Box 7914, Spanish Fort, AL 36577) by Linda Cone Selensky. (tot) | |
Monday, April 28, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 ENDORSED ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/28/2014. (copy mailed to Plf on 4/28/14) (tot) | |
Friday, April 25, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 RESPONSE to3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by Linda Cone Selensky. (tot) | |
5 | 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Report & Recommendation by Linda Cone Selensky. (tot) | |
Thursday, April 24, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 RESPONSE to3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by Linda Cone Selensky. (tot) | |
Monday, April 07, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that this action be dismissed w/prejudice, prior to service, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction & as frivolous as set out. Objections to R&R due by 4/28/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 4/7/2014. (copy mailed to Plf on 4/7/14) (tot) | |
Friday, February 14, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Linda Cone Selensky. . (tot) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against State of Alabama filed by Linda Cone Selensky. (tot) |