City of Almaty, Kazakhstan et al v. Sater et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | John G Koeltl |
Referred: | Katharine H Parker |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-02645 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332fr Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 21, 2019 5:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
Bayrock Group, Inc
251 Little Falls Drive
Wilmington, DE 19808 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Global Habitat Solutions, Inc.
130 Shore Road #200
Port Washington, NY 11050 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
MeM Energy Partners LLC
251 Little Falls Drive
Wilmington, DE 19808 |
|
Defendant
RRMI-DR LLC
333 East 66th Street #14D
New York, NY 10065 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Daniel Ridloff
333 East 66th Street #14D
New York, NY 10065 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Felix Sater
94 Sands Point Road
Port Washington, NY 11050 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ferrari Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Frederick M Oberlander
Montauk, NY 11954
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BTA Bank JSC
55 Hudson Yards
New York, NY 10001 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Almaty, Kazakhstan
55 Hudson Yards
New York, NY 10001 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 1:00 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
538 | 538
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Seal
Thu 04/18 12:42 PM
ORDER granting525 Letter Motion to Seal. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/18/2024) (ks) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
537 | 537
68
pgs
trial
Request to Charge
Wed 04/17 11:55 PM
REQUEST TO CHARGE. Document filed by MeM Energy Partners LLC..(Henken, Matthew) |
|
536 | 536
trial
Proposed Voir Dire Questions
Wed 04/17 11:52 PM
PROPOSED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS. Document filed by MeM Energy Partners LLC..(Henken, Matthew) |
|
535 | 535
trial
Proposed Voir Dire Questions
Wed 04/17 10:00 PM
PROPOSED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan..(Schwartz, Matthew) |
|
534 | 534
trial
Proposed Jury Instructions
Wed 04/17 9:58 PM
PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan..(Schwartz, Matthew) |
|
533 | 533
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Wed 04/17 9:57 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Matthew L. Schwartz in Support re:530 MOTION in Limine No. 3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND TESTIMONY OF ALLEGED POLITICAL PERSECUTION BY NON-PARTIES OF NON-PARTIES .,528 MOTION in Limine No. 2 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING LITCO .,526 MOTION in Limine No. 1 TO ADMIT DEPOSITION TESTIMONY FROM THE RELATED TRIADOU ACTION .. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan, Bayrock Group, Inc, Ferrari Holdings LLC, Global Habitat Solutions, Inc., MeM Energy Partners LLC, RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff, Felix Sater.Motion or Order to File Under Seal:525 .(Schwartz, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 7 | ||
532 | 532
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Wed 04/17 9:54 PM
DECLARATION of Matthew L. Schwartz in Support re:530 MOTION in Limine No. 3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND TESTIMONY OF ALLEGED POLITICAL PERSECUTION BY NON-PARTIES OF NON-PARTIES .,528 MOTION in Limine No. 2 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING LITCO .,526 MOTION in Limine No. 1 TO ADMIT DEPOSITION TESTIMONY FROM THE RELATED TRIADOU ACTION .. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan..(Schwartz, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 (slipsheet), | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 (slipsheet), | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 | ||
531 | 531
21
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Wed 04/17 9:48 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:530 MOTION in Limine No. 3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND TESTIMONY OF ALLEGED POLITICAL PERSECUTION BY NON-PARTIES OF NON-PARTIES . . Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan..(Schwartz, Matthew) |
|
530 | 530
2
pgs
motion
In Limine
Wed 04/17 9:47 PM
MOTION in Limine No. 3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND TESTIMONY OF ALLEGED POLITICAL PERSECUTION BY NON-PARTIES OF NON-PARTIES . Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan..(Schwartz, Matthew) |
|
529 | 529
14
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Wed 04/17 9:44 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:528 MOTION in Limine No. 2 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING LITCO . . Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan..(Schwartz, Matthew) |
|
528 | 528
motion
In Limine
Wed 04/17 9:41 PM
MOTION in Limine No. 2 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING LITCO . Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan..(Schwartz, Matthew) |
|
527 | 527
26
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Wed 04/17 9:40 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:526 MOTION in Limine No. 1 TO ADMIT DEPOSITION TESTIMONY FROM THE RELATED TRIADOU ACTION . . Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan..(Schwartz, Matthew) |
|
526 | 526
2
pgs
motion
In Limine
Wed 04/17 9:39 PM
MOTION in Limine No. 1 TO ADMIT DEPOSITION TESTIMONY FROM THE RELATED TRIADOU ACTION . Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan..(Schwartz, Matthew) |
|
525 | 525
motion
Seal
Wed 04/17 9:34 PM
LETTER MOTION to Seal Certain Exhibits to Declaration of Matthew L. Schwartz In Support of Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Matthew L. Schwartz dated April 17, 2024. Document filed by BTA Bank JSC, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan..(Schwartz, Matthew) |
|
524 | 524
trial
Proposed Jury Instructions
Wed 04/17 6:53 PM
PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Document filed by Felix Sater..(Sima, Thomas) |
|
523 | 523
trial
Proposed Voir Dire Questions
Wed 04/17 6:52 PM
PROPOSED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS. Document filed by Felix Sater..(Sima, Thomas) |
|
522 | 522
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Seal
Wed 04/17 4:05 PM
ORDER granting517 Letter Motion to Seal. Application to file under Seal granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/17/2024) (ks) |
|
521 | 521
20
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Wed 04/17 1:38 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:518 MOTION in Limine To Preclude or Limit The Testimony of Certain Witnesses . . Document filed by RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff..(Levi, Jill) |
|
520 | 520
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Wed 04/17 1:36 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Jill Levi in Support re:518 MOTION in Limine To Preclude or Limit The Testimony of Certain Witnesses .. Document filed by RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff, BTA Bank JSC, Bayrock Group, Inc, City of Almaty, Kazakhstan, Ferrari Holdings LLC, Global Habitat Solutions, Inc., John H. Snyder PLLC, MeM Energy Partners LLC, Felix Sater.Motion or Order to File Under Seal:517 .(Levi, Jill) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A -Expert Report of Claude Arnold, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Expert Report of Seth R. Fliegler, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Expert Report of David Schechtman, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - NYS License of Daniel Ridloff, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Settlement Agreement and General Release | ||
519 | 519
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Wed 04/17 1:26 PM
DECLARATION of Jill Levi in Support re:518 MOTION in Limine To Preclude or Limit The Testimony of Certain Witnesses .. Document filed by RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff..(Levi, Jill) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Expert Report of Claude Arnold, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Expert Report of Seth R. Fliegler, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Expert Report of David Schechtman, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - NYS License of Daniel Ridloff, | ||
Att: 5 1 pgs Exhibit Exhibit E - Settlement Agreement and General Release | ||
518 | 518
2
pgs
motion
In Limine
Wed 04/17 1:18 PM
MOTION in Limine To Preclude or Limit The Testimony of Certain Witnesses . Document filed by RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff..(Levi, Jill) |
|
517 | 517
2
pgs
motion
Seal
Wed 04/17 12:59 PM
LETTER MOTION to Seal Certain Declaration Exhibits to Ridloff Defendants' Motion in Limine addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Jill Levi dated April 17, 2024. Document filed by RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff..(Levi, Jill) |
|
516 | 516
71
pgs
trial
Proposed Jury Instructions
Wed 04/17 12:55 PM
PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Document filed by RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff..(Levi, Jill) |
|
515 | 515
16
pgs
trial
Proposed Voir Dire Questions
Wed 04/17 12:53 PM
PROPOSED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS. Document filed by RRMI-DR LLC, Daniel Ridloff..(Levi, Jill) |