Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:John R Adams
Case #: 5:19-cv-00681
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2019
Terminated:Jul 08, 2019
Last checked: Monday Sep 23, 2019 4:55 AM EDT
Defendant
Joi Hemphill
Represented By
Andrea D. Uhler
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Wayne County
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Marshal M. Pitchford
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Daniel R. Lutz
Kropf, Wagner, Hohenberger & Lutz
contact info
Defendant
Mark Koenig
Defendant
Rusty Knopp
Represented By
Andrea D. Uhler
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Wayne County
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Marshal M. Pitchford
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Daniel R. Lutz
Kropf, Wagner, Hohenberger & Lutz
contact info
Defendant
Joseph D. Knight
6177 Back Orrville Rd.
Wooster, OH 44691
Defendant
Roger W. Kienzle, Jr.
Represented By
Andrea D. Uhler
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Wayne County
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Marshal M. Pitchford
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Daniel R. Lutz
Kropf, Wagner, Hohenberger & Lutz
contact info
Defendant
Heather Kelly
Represented By
James M. Richard
Richard Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Travis Hutchinson
Represented By
Andrea D. Uhler
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Wayne County
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Marshal M. Pitchford
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Daniel R. Lutz
Kropf, Wagner, Hohenberger & Lutz
contact info
Defendant
Doug Hunter
Represented By
Andrea D. Uhler
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Wayne County
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Marshal M. Pitchford
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Daniel R. Lutz
Kropf, Wagner, Hohenberger & Lutz
contact info
Defendant
Jim Hostetler
Preacher, Aukerman Church of God 5344 Congress Rd.
Wooster, OH 44691
Defendant
Gayle Hostetler
Preacher's wife 5344 Congress Rd.
Wooster, OH 44691
Defendant
Michelle Hobart
Represented By
Andrea D. Uhler
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Wayne County
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Marshal M. Pitchford
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Daniel R. Lutz
Kropf, Wagner, Hohenberger & Lutz
contact info
Defendant
James Henry
Represented By
Andrea D. Uhler
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Wayne County
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Marshal M. Pitchford
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Daniel R. Lutz
Kropf, Wagner, Hohenberger & Lutz
contact info
Defendant
Officer Kohler
Represented By
Todd M. Raskin
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Cleveland
contact info
Cynthia L. Sands
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Cleveland
contact info
Defendant
Officer Brett Haven
Represented By
Irving B. Sugerman
Brouse Mcdowell - Akron
contact info
Defendant
Brad Harp
Represented By
Andrea D. Uhler
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Wayne County
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Marshal M. Pitchford
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Daniel R. Lutz
Kropf, Wagner, Hohenberger & Lutz
contact info
Defendant
Jonathan Hamers
Represented By
Andrea D. Uhler
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Wayne County
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Marshal M. Pitchford
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Daniel R. Lutz
Kropf, Wagner, Hohenberger & Lutz
contact info
Defendant
Tiffany Gibson
Defendant
Martin Frantz
Represented By
Andrea D. Uhler
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Wayne County
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Marshal M. Pitchford
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Daniel R. Lutz
Kropf, Wagner, Hohenberger & Lutz
contact info
Defendant
Ronald Fletcher
Represented By
Andrea D. Uhler
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Wayne County
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Marshal M. Pitchford
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Daniel R. Lutz
Kropf, Wagner, Hohenberger & Lutz
contact info
Defendant
M.D. Gwendolyn Fletcher
Represented By
Justin S. Greenfelder
Buckingham, Doolittle & Burroughs - Canton
contact info
Joseph J. Feltes
Buckingham, Doolittle & Burroughs
contact info
Defendant
Douglas Dumolt
Represented By
Andrea D. Uhler
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Wayne County
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Marshal M. Pitchford
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Daniel R. Lutz
Kropf, Wagner, Hohenberger & Lutz
contact info
Defendant
Jason Crawford
Represented By
Andrea D. Uhler
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Wayne County
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Marshal M. Pitchford
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Daniel R. Lutz
Kropf, Wagner, Hohenberger & Lutz
contact info
Defendant
Lucy Cordell
Represented By
David V. Gedrock
contact info
Defendant
Shawn Ropchock
Defendant
Terra Lyn Hider
Employee at LUK U.S.A. INVALID ADDRESS 2398 Weaver Drive
Wooster, OH 44691
Defendant
Beverly Wire
Defendant
Timothy VanSickle
Represented By
Lisa M. Zaring
Montgomery Jonson - Cincinnati
contact info
Lindsay M. Upton
Montgomery Jonson - Cincinnati
contact info
Defendant
Mike Smith
Represented By
Andrea D. Uhler
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Wayne County
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Marshal M. Pitchford
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Daniel R. Lutz
Kropf, Wagner, Hohenberger & Lutz
contact info
Defendant
David Tomhas Smith
7029 Gable Rd.
West Salem, OH 44287
Defendant
Christina Faye Smith
7029 Gable Rd.
West Salem, OH 44287
Defendant
Nathan Shaker
Represented By
Andrea D. Uhler
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Wayne County
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Marshal M. Pitchford
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Daniel R. Lutz
Kropf, Wagner, Hohenberger & Lutz
contact info
Defendant
Jim Senz, Sr.
Represented By
Chris G. Manos
contact info
Defendant
Jodie Schumacher
Represented By
Andrea D. Uhler
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Wayne County
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Marshal M. Pitchford
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Daniel R. Lutz
Kropf, Wagner, Hohenberger & Lutz
contact info
Defendant
Steve Saurer
Represented By
Andrea D. Uhler
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Wayne County
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Marshal M. Pitchford
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Daniel R. Lutz
Kropf, Wagner, Hohenberger & Lutz
contact info
Defendant
Gerald Roper
Defendant
Paul Brumme
Represented By
Andrea D. Uhler
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Wayne County
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Marshal M. Pitchford
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Daniel R. Lutz
Kropf, Wagner, Hohenberger & Lutz
contact info
Defendant
Conrad Olson
Defendant
Randall Muth
Represented By
Andrea D. Uhler
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Wayne County
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Marshal M. Pitchford
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Daniel R. Lutz
Kropf, Wagner, Hohenberger & Lutz
contact info
Defendant
Marie Moore
Defendant
Carol Milhoan
Represented By
Lisa M. Zaring
Montgomery Jonson - Cincinnati
contact info
Lindsay M. Upton
Montgomery Jonson - Cincinnati
contact info
Defendant
Thomas Maurer
Represented By
Andrea D. Uhler
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Wayne County
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Marshal M. Pitchford
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Daniel R. Lutz
Kropf, Wagner, Hohenberger & Lutz
contact info
Defendant
Kevin Lenart
3020 McAfee Rd.
Wooster, OH 44691
Represented By
Todd E. Cheek
contact info
Defendant
Raymond Leisy
Represented By
Lisa M. Zaring
Montgomery Jonson - Cincinnati
contact info
Lindsay M. Upton
Montgomery Jonson - Cincinnati
contact info
Defendant
Jeffery Layton
15 7571 North Elyria Rd.
West Salem, OH 44287
Defendant
Stella Louise Kreighbaum
7027 Gable Rd.
West Salem, OH 44287
Defendant
Ryan Koster
Represented By
Andrea D. Uhler
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Wayne County
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Marshal M. Pitchford
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Daniel R. Lutz
Kropf, Wagner, Hohenberger & Lutz
contact info
Defendant
Brian Criss
INVALID ADDRESS 6570 N. Elyria Rd.
West Salem, OH 44287
Defendant
Tiffany Green
Represented By
Andrea D. Uhler
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Wayne County
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Marshal M. Pitchford
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Daniel R. Lutz
Kropf, Wagner, Hohenberger & Lutz
contact info
Defendant
Gina Fordenwalt
Owner, Twin Peaks Restoration 9496 Twp. Rd. 50
Mansfield, OH 44904
Defendant
Dana Fordenwalt
Employee, Twin Peaks Restoration 9496 Twp Rd 50
Mansfied, OH 44904
Defendant
Taulbe Flory
Defendant
Dennis Felter
Bailiff, Wayne County Municipal Court 215 N. Grant St.
Wooster, OH 44691
Represented By
Andrea D. Uhler
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Wayne County
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Marshal M. Pitchford
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Daniel R. Lutz
Kropf, Wagner, Hohenberger & Lutz
contact info
Defendant
Stephanie Farley
Bailiff, Wayne County Municipal Court 215 N. Grant St.
Wooster, OH 44691
Represented By
Andrea D. Uhler
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Wayne County
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Marshal M. Pitchford
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Daniel R. Lutz
Kropf, Wagner, Hohenberger & Lutz
contact info
Defendant
Terry English
Defendant
Bret Defibaugh
927 E. Bowman St.
Wooster, OH 44691
Defendant
Mike DeWine
Ohio Attorney General 30 E. Board St.
Columbus, OH 43215
Represented By
Tiffany L. Carwile
Office Of The Attorney General - Constitutional Offices
contact info
Zachery P. Keller
Office Of The Attorney General - Constitutional Offices
contact info
Defendant
Joyce Davis
6570 N. Elyria Road
West Salem, OH 44287
Defendant
Bill Davis
6570 N. Elyria Road
West Salem, OH 44287
Defendant
Taylor Kuntz
Defendant
Erica Craver
Represented By
Justin S. Greenfelder
Buckingham, Doolittle & Burroughs - Canton
contact info
Joseph J. Feltes
Buckingham, Doolittle & Burroughs
contact info
Defendant
Mark Clark
Represented By
Lisa M. Zaring
Montgomery Jonson - Cincinnati
contact info
Lindsay M. Upton
Montgomery Jonson - Cincinnati
contact info
Defendant
Staci Chuci
Represented By
Andrea D. Uhler
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Wayne County
contact info
John D. Latchney
O'Toole Mclaughlin Dooley & Pecora
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Marshal M. Pitchford
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Daniel R. Lutz
Kropf, Wagner, Hohenberger & Lutz
contact info
Defendant
Adam Chellis
Deputy, Wayne County Sheriff's Department 201 W. N. St.
Wooster, OH 44691
Represented By
Andrea D. Uhler
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Wayne County
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Marshal M. Pitchford
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Daniel R. Lutz
Kropf, Wagner, Hohenberger & Lutz
contact info
Defendant
Mike Burkholder
Principal, Northwestern High Schoool 7571 North Elyria Rd.
West Salem, OH 44287
Defendant
Michael Burkey
Deputy, Wayne County Sheriff's Department 201 W. N. St.
Wooster, OH 44691
Represented By
Andrea D. Uhler
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Wayne County
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Marshal M. Pitchford
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Daniel R. Lutz
Kropf, Wagner, Hohenberger & Lutz
contact info
Defendant
Becky Beltz
Represented By
Andrea D. Uhler
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Wayne County
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Marshal M. Pitchford
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Daniel R. Lutz
Kropf, Wagner, Hohenberger & Lutz
contact info
Defendant
Bailiff Rizzo
Bailiff, Medina County Municipal Court 135 N. Elmwood St.
Medina, OH 44256
Represented By
Amily A. Imbrogno
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Solon
contact info
James A. Climer
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Cleveland
contact info
Defendant
Bailiff Meding
Bailiff, Medina County Municipal Court 135 N. Emwood St.
Medina, OH 44256
Represented By
Amily A. Imbrogno
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Solon
contact info
James A. Climer
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Cleveland
contact info
Defendant
Kenneth Bailey
Represented By
Tyrone E. Reed
Reeds Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Officer Hamilton
Officer, Creston Police Department 120 Brooklyn Ave.
Creston, OH 44217
Represented By
John D. Latchney
O'Toole Mclaughlin Dooley & Pecora
contact info
Defendant
Jerry Bauders
Represented By
Andrea D. Uhler
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Wayne County
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Marshal M. Pitchford
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Daniel R. Lutz
Kropf, Wagner, Hohenberger & Lutz
contact info
Defendant
Alex Abel
Represented By
Andrea D. Uhler
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Wayne County
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Marshal M. Pitchford
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Daniel R. Lutz
Kropf, Wagner, Hohenberger & Lutz
contact info
Defendant
Bob Wright
Defendant
Cory Spitler
Represented By
Lisa M. Zaring
Montgomery Jonson - Cincinnati
contact info
Lindsay M. Upton
Montgomery Jonson - Cincinnati
contact info
Defendant
Rodney Roper
Defendant
Christy Roper
Defendant
Scott Ries
Deputy, Wayne County Sheriff's Department 201 W. N. St.
Wooster, OH 44691
Represented By
Andrea D. Uhler
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Wayne County
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Marshal M. Pitchford
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Daniel R. Lutz
Kropf, Wagner, Hohenberger & Lutz
contact info
Defendant
William Rickett
Represented By
Lisa M. Zaring
Montgomery Jonson - Cincinnati
contact info
Lindsay M. Upton
Montgomery Jonson - Cincinnati
contact info
Defendant
Michael Rickett
Prosecuting Attorney, Wayne County Juvenile Court 215 N. Grant St.
Wooster, OH 44691
Represented By
Lisa M. Zaring
Montgomery Jonson - Cincinnati
contact info
Lindsay M. Upton
Montgomery Jonson - Cincinnati
contact info
Defendant
Jerry Packard
Represented By
Andrea D. Uhler
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Wayne County
contact info
Benjamin R. Sorber
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Marshal M. Pitchford
Dicaudo Pitchford & Yoder
contact info
Daniel R. Lutz
Kropf, Wagner, Hohenberger & Lutz
contact info
Defendant
Kenny Murphy
INVALID ADDRESS 6059 Camp Road
West Salem, OH 44287
Defendant
Jenny Murphy
6059 Camp Road
West Salem, OH 44287
Defendant
Stephen McIlvaine
Judge, Wadsworth Municipal Court 120 Maple St.
Wadsworth, OH 44281
Represented By
Lisa M. Zaring
Montgomery Jonson - Cincinnati
contact info
Lindsay M. Upton
Montgomery Jonson - Cincinnati
contact info
Defendant
Wayne Lenart
3020 McAfee Rd.
Wooster, OH 44691
Represented By
Justin E. Chenevey
contact info
David M. Todaro
Law Office Of David M. Todaro
contact info
Defendant
Logan Lenart
Defendant
Kelli Lenart
Defendant
Jaren Lenart
Defendant
George Lenart
Defendant
Brandon Lash
Plaintiff
Steven Ray Murphy
11043 Myers Road
West Salem, OH 44287

GPO Jul 08 2019
Memorandum Opinion and Order dismissing this matter for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction pursuant to the Court's authority established in Apple v. Glenn, 183 F.3d 477. In light of this dismissal, the various dispositive and other motions by the defendants are denied as moot. The plaintiff's motion for leave to file a 2nd Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 103) is denied on the basis that such amendment would be futile and frivolous. The Court further certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. Judge John R. Adams on 7/8/19. (K,C)
GPO Mar 09 2020
Memorandum Opinion and Order. For the reasons stated in this Order, the 131 motion for Rule 11 Sanctions is granted, and it is hereby ORDERED that Stephen Ray Murphy is PERMANENTLY ENJOINED from filing any new lawsuits or any other documents in federal court without seeking and obtaining leave of court in accordance with the restrictions outlined in this Order. Also, the Clerk's Office is hereby Ordered not to file any document unless it is in compliance with the restrictions outlined in this Order and the Clerk's Office shall not accept any fees or documents in connection with any Motion Pursuant to Court Order Seeking Leave to File which Mr. Murphy files, unless and until leave is granted. See Order for complete details. Judge John R. Adams on 03/09/2020. (M,TL)

Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 09, 2020
132 132 minutes ~Util - Terminate Motions Memorandum Opinion and Order ~Util - Restricted Filer Mon 03/09 2:23 PM
Memorandum Opinion and Order. For the reasons stated in this Order, the131 motion for Rule 11 Sanctions is granted, and it is hereby ORDERED that Stephen Ray Murphy is PERMANENTLY ENJOINED from filing any new lawsuits or any other documents in federal court without seeking and obtaining leave of court in accordance with the restrictions outlined in this Order. Also, the Clerk's Office is hereby Ordered not to file any document unless it is in compliance with the restrictions outlined in this Order and the Clerk's Office shall not accept any fees or documents in connection with any Motion Pursuant to Court Order Seeking Leave to File which Mr. Murphy files, unless and until leave is granted. See Order for complete details. Judge John R. Adams on 03/09/2020. (M,TL)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Mon 03/09 2:41 PM
Copy of132 Memorandum Opinion and Order mailed to Steven Ray Murphy, 11043 Myers Road, West Salem, OH 44287; Joseph D. Knight, 6177 Back Orrville Rd., Wooster, OH 44691; Mike Burkholder, 7571 North Elyria Rd., West Salem, OH 44287; Jeffery Layton, 15, 7571 North Elyria Rd., West Salem, OH 44287; Dana Fordenwalt & Gina Fordenwalt, 9496 Twp Rd 50, Mansfied, OH 44904; Joyce Davis, 6570 N. Elyria Road, West Salem, OH 44287; Bill Davis, 6570 N. Elyria Road, West Salem, OH 44287; Jenny Murphy, 6059 Camp Road, West Salem, OH 44287; Bret Defibaugh, 927 E. Bowman St., Wooster, OH 44691; Jim Hostetler & Gayle Hostetler, 5344 Congress Rd., Wooster, OH 44691; David Tomhas Smith & Christina Faye Smith, 7029 Gable Rd., West Salem, OH 44287 and Stella Louise Kreighbaum, 7027 Gable Rd., West Salem, OH 44287. (M,TL)
Related: [-]