Speed RMG Partners, LLC et al v. Artic Cat Sales, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando M Olguin |
Referred: | Gail J Standish |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-02362 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2019 |
Terminated: | Feb 25, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 24, 2019 2:28 AM PDT |
Defendant
Textron Specialized Vehicles, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Textron, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arctic Cat Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arctic Cat Sales Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robby Gordon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Todd Romano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Speed RMG Partners, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
85 | 85
14
pgs
order
Dismiss Case Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Wed 02/26 10:59 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Arctic Cat defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer42 is granted in part and denied in part. Arctic Cat defendants' Personal Jurisdiction Motion57 is denied as moot. The Clerk shall transfer this case forthwith to the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (iv) |
|
Thursday, February 20, 2020 | ||
84 | 84
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 02/20 12:33 PM
NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish scheduling a Pre-Discovery Motion Telephone Conference regarding the parties' February 19, 2020 email for 3/4/2020 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. Counsel shall meet and confer to set up a bridge line and provide the call in information to the Court. Additionally, counsel shall notify the Court Clerk via email at GJS_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov of the name of each counsel appearing on the call. NOTE: During the telephone hearing, counsel must identify themselves before they speak for the benefit of the court and the court recorder/reporter.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (efc) |