Joint Admin
|
1:19-bk-10972 - Point Roll, Inc.
|
03/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
1:19-bk-10973 - Sizmek DSP, Inc.
|
03/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
1:19-bk-10974 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc.
|
03/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
1:19-bk-10975 - Wireless Artist LLC
|
03/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
1:19-bk-10976 - WirelessDeveloper, Inc.
|
03/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
1:19-bk-10977 - X Plus One Solutions, Inc.
|
03/29/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
1:19-bk-10978 - X Plus Two Solutions, LLC
|
03/29/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-01116 - Kreiner v. Sizmek Inc.
|
04/11/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
1:19-bk-13866 - Solomon Acquisition Corp.
|
12/05/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01015 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. et al v. Zeta Global Holdings Corp.
|
02/14/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01017 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. 1Life Healthcare, Inc.
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01018 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Address Srl
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01019 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. AerServ LLC
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01020 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. ALKU Technologies , LLC
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01021 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Atlassian Pty Ltd.
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01022 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. AudienceProject
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01023 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. CMS Hasche Sigle
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01024 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Connatix Native Exchange Inc.
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01025 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Consulting Maine, LLC
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01026 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Continuent, Ltd.
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01027 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Dark Charm Creative, LLC
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01028 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. et al v. Dell Marketing L.P.
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01029 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Evidon, Inc.
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01030 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Grant Thornton LLP
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01031 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Guckenheimer Enterprises, Inc.
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01032 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Hello! Las Vegas Destination Management, Inc.
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01033 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Jobvite, Inc.
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01034 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Kahuna Media srl
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01035 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Marketo, Inc.
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01036 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Matrix It Integration & Infrastructures Ltd.
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01037 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. et al v. New Relic, Inc.
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01038 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. NTT America, Inc.
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01039 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. OtterBase, Inc.
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01040 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Oxford Global Resources, LLC
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01041 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Secure Talent, Inc.
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01042 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. SolarWinds ITSM US, Inc.
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01043 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. SP Plus Corporation
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01044 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Spark Public Relations, LLC
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01045 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Starcom Italia s.r.l.
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01046 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Tekreliance LLC
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01047 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. et al v. Verizon Communications Inc.
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01048 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Voyage Group Inc.
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01049 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Washington Speakers Bureau Inc.
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01050 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. eMarketer Inc.
|
02/18/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01093 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. 401 Park Avenue South Associates LLC
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01094 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Addison Professional Financial Search LLC
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01095 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. American Association of Advertising Agencies, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01096 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. American Express Company
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01097 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Amsalem Business Travel, LLC
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01098 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Aon Consulting, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01099 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. ASA Computers, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01100 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Banyan Street/GAP 191 Peachtree Owner, LLC
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01101 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Baruch Triad, LLC
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01102 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Beachfront Media LLC
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01103 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Bezeq international Ltd.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01104 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Bidswitch Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01105 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Brand Innovators LLC
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01106 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. BRE HH Property Owner LLC
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01107 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. BRE River North Point Owner LLC
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01108 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Catchpoint Systems, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01109 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. CBRE, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01111 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Comcast International France SAS
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01112 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Confiant Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01113 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. CREFII-SCC, LLC
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01114 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Cuebiq Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01115 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Culhane Meadows Haughian & Walsh PLLC
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01116 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Davis & Partners LLC
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01117 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Dell Financial Services LLC
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01118 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Digiday Media LLC
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01119 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. DoubleVerify Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01120 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. E*TRADE Financial Corporate Services, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01121 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Entech Network Solutions, LLC.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01122 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. ExchangeWire Limited
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01123 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Eyeota Pte Ltd.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01124 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Facebook, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01125 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Filmless, LLC
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01126 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Forrester Research, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01127 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Foursquare Labs, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01128 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Friedman Properties, Ltd.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01129 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Geniee International Pte Ltd.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01130 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. GitHub, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01131 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. GrubHub Holdings Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01132 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Infinidat, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01133 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Insight Direct USA, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01134 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Integral Ad Science, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01135 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Internap Corporation
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01136 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Intuit Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01137 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01138 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Level 3 Financing, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01139 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Media.net Advertising FZ-LLC
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01140 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Moat Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01141 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. National Project Group Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01142 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Native Ads, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01143 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Neustar Information Services, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01144 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Oath Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01145 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Oracle America Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01146 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Osborne Clarke LLP
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01147 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Outbrain Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01148 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. PubMatic, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01149 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. PulsePoint, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01150 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. PwC Isreal - Kesselman & Kessselman C.P.A.s
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01151 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. QuickBase, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01152 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. RhythmOne (US) Holding, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01153 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. RingCentral, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01154 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Salesforce.com, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01155 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Sansome Holdings, L.P.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01156 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Sigma Technology Solutions, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01157 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Slack Technologies, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01158 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Sonobi, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01159 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Sovrn, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01160 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Splash Consulting of Missouri LLC
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01161 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. SpotX, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01162 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Stonebranch, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01163 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Stroeer SSP GmbH
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01164 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Switch, Ltd.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01165 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Talent Advantage Group, LLC
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01166 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Tapad, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01167 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. TechSpace Inc
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01168 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. TEGNA Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01169 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Telaria, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01170 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Telstra International Limited
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01171 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Texas EZPAWN, L.P.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01172 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. The Nielsen Company (US), LLC
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01173 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. The Nielsen Company (US), LLC
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01174 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. The Rubicon Project, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01175 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Twitter, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01176 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Viamedia, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01177 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Wide-Out Workforces Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01178 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Zayo Group, LLC
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01179 - Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Zoom Video Communications, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01180 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. et al v. CDW LLC
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01181 - Sizmek Technologies, Inc. et al v. GTT Communications, Inc.
|
06/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:21-ap-01098 - Nisselson v. District M Inc.
|
03/22/2021
|
Adversary
|
1:21-ap-01099 - Nisselson v. Google Inc.
|
03/22/2021
|
Adversary
|
1:21-ap-01100 - Nisselson v. Group M Worldwide, LLC
|
03/22/2021
|
Adversary
|
1:21-ap-01101 - Nisselson v. GumGum, Inc.
|
03/22/2021
|
Adversary
|
1:21-ap-01102 - Nisselson v. Sublime Skinz Labs SA
|
03/22/2021
|
Adversary
|
1:21-ap-01103 - Nisselson v. Verizon Communications Inc.
|
03/22/2021
|
Adversary
|
1:21-ap-01104 - Nisselson v. Xandr Inc.
|
03/22/2021
|
Adversary
|
1:21-ap-01160 - Nitel, Inc. v. Cerberus Business Finance, LLC et al
|
06/10/2021
|