TED CRUZ FOR SENATE et al v. FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Amit P Mehta |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-00908 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 02:437 Federal Election Commission |
Case Filed: | Apr 01, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 03, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 28, 2019 4:51 AM EDT |
Defendant
FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CAROLINE C. HUNTER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MATTHEW S. PETERSEN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
STEVEN T. WALTHER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ELLEN L. WEINTRAUB
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RAFAEL EDWARD CRUZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TED CRUZ FOR SENATE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, June 17, 2022 | ||
77 | 77
appeal
Supreme Court Judgment
Tue 06/21 10:31 AM
SUPREME COURT JUDGMENT (certified copy) as to73 NOTICE of Filing an Appeal with the Supreme Court,74 Amended NOTICE of Filing an Appeal with the Supreme Court. Supreme Court case number: 21-12. (ztth) Modified link on 6/21/2022 (znmw). |