Robinson v. Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | David C Godbey |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-00794 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Apr 01, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 02, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 28, 2019 4:15 AM CDT |
Defendant
Lowe's Home Centers LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Montarvo Robinson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, June 02, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation
Tue 06/02 12:55 PM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice by Montarvo Robinson. (Neill, Christine) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Optional)
Tue 06/02 1:17 PM
Civil Case Terminated per17 Stipulation of Dismissal. (axm) |
||
Tuesday, February 18, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
service
Affidavit of Service
Tue 02/18 12:19 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Produce Documents served on Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. on 02/07/2020. (Williams, Laura) |
|
15 | 15
service
Affidavit of Service
Tue 02/18 12:18 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Produce Documents served on Select Realty and Management Company, LLC on 02/07/2020. (Williams, Laura) |
|
14 | 14
service
Affidavit of Service
Tue 02/18 12:16 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Produce Documents served on 84 Lumber Co. on 02/07/2020. (Williams, Laura) |
|
Wednesday, February 12, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 02/12 9:55 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Produce Documents served on Indeed, Inc. on 02/06/2020. (Jackson, Claudine) |
|
12 | 12
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 02/12 9:54 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Produce Documents served on Target Corporation on 02/06/2020. (Jackson, Claudine) |
|
11 | 11
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 02/12 9:53 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Produce Documents served on Walmart, Inc. on 02/06/2020. (Jackson, Claudine) |
|
Friday, January 31, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Fri 01/31 11:45 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laura Bradarich Williams on behalf of Lowe's Home Centers LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Williams, Laura) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
Protective Order
Mon 07/22 3:25 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/22/2019) (ykp) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
8
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/26 12:17 PM
INITIAL DISCOVERY ORDER FOR EMPLOYMENT CASES (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/26/2019) (epm) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/25 1:18 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lowe's Home Centers LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Lowe's Companies, Inc. for Lowe's Home Centers LLC. (Jackson, Claudine) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/25 1:15 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand filed by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Claudine G Jackson added to party Lowe's Home Centers LLC(pty:dft) (Jackson, Claudine) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned
Mon 04/08 3:08 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Lowe's Home Centers LLC ; served on 4/4/2019. (ndt) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/01 2:38 PM
Summons Issued as to Lowe's Home Centers LLC. (mla) |
|
3 | 3
qcref
Godbey
Mon 04/01 2:36 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/01 1:58 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Montarvo Robinson. (Neill, Christine) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/01 1:51 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Lowe's Home Centers LLC filed by Montarvo Robinson. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9887488) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Neill, Christine) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |