Moncada v. Gucci America, Inc.
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | William P Dimitrouleas |
Referred: | Lurana S Snow |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-60861 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 02, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 29, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 29, 2019 5:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Gucci America, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Moncada
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, April 29, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 04/30 8:58 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Notice DE10 is hereby APPROVED. This action is DISMISSED with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and fees except as otherwise agreed The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case and DENY any pending motions as moot. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty
Mon 04/29 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Daniel Moncada (Hannah, Roderick) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 04/23 3:49 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff has until May 2, 2019 to file the appropriate dismissal documents. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/23/2019. (vty) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 04/17 4:06 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation for Dismissal witih Prejudice by Daniel Moncada. Responses due by 5/1/2019(Hannah, Roderick) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 08, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Settlement - aty
Mon 04/08 4:33 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Daniel Moncada (Hannah, Roderick) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 04/05 4:44 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Daniel Moncada. Gucci America, Inc. waiver sent on 4/5/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (Hannah, Roderick) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Thu 04/04 9:28 AM
ORDER REQUIRING CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL REGARDING ANY PRIOR FILINGS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb) |
|
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report
Thu 04/04 9:26 AM
ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/02 1:35 PM
Summons Issued as to Gucci America, Inc.. (ail) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Tue 04/02 1:24 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ail) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/02 12:06 PM
COMPLAINT against Gucci America, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11524442, filed by Daniel Moncada.(Duran, Pelayo) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Summon(s) |