KOS BUILDING GROUP, LLC v. R.S. Granoff Architects, P.C. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Philip M Halpern |
Referred: | Andrew E Krause |
Case #: | 7:19-cv-02918 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 02, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 01, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 29, 2019 6:48 AM EDT |
Defendant
Richard S Granoff
9 Witherell Drive
Greenwich, CT 06831 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
R.S. Granoff Architects, P.C.
330 Railroad Avenue
Greenwich, CT 06830 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KOS Building Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 01, 2022 | ||
73 | 73
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Terminated - Submitted
Tue 03/01 10:07 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 3/1/2022 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights.(km) |
|
72 | 72
order
Judgment - Clerk
Tue 03/01 10:03 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re:71 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment in favor of R.S. Granoff Architects, P.C., Richard S Granoff against KOS Building Group, LLC. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated February 28, 2022, and for the reasons indicated on the record and law cited therein, Defendants' motion for summary judgment pursuant to Rule 56 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is GRANTED; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 3/1/2022) (km) |
|
Att: 1 Right to Appeal | ||
Monday, February 28, 2022 | ||
71 | 71
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Mon 02/28 5:11 PM
ORDER granting58 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants. For the reasons indicated on the record and law cited therein, Defendants' motion for summary judgment pursuant to Rule 56 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is GRANTED. See transcript. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the pending motion (Doc. 58) and close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 2/28/2022) (jca) |
|
minutes
Oral Argument
Mon 02/28 4:33 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Philip M. Halpern: Oral Argument held on 2/28/2022. Counsel for all parties appeared in Courtroom 520. The Court granted Defendants' motion for summary judgment. A written order will be docketed separately. See Transcript. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Sue Ghoreyab) (fc) |