Toussaint v. Care.com, Inc. et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Denise J Casper |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-10628 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 12:22 Securities Fraud |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2019 |
Terminated: | Sep 25, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 05, 2020 9:19 AM EST |
Defendant
Care.com, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Echenberg
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sheila Lirio Marcelo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lesedi Toussaint
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Sep 25 2020
Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. The Court ALLOWS the Defendants' motion to dismiss, D. 23. (McKillop, Matthew) |
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, September 25, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 09/25 9:09 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(McKillop, Matthew) |
|
30 | 30
17
pgs
order
Memorandum & Order
Fri 09/25 8:57 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. The Court ALLOWS the Defendants' motion to dismiss, D. 23. (McKillop, Matthew) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
minutes
Motion Hearing Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 02/07 2:10 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Denise J. Casper: Motion Hearing held on 2/7/2020 re23 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint, filed by Michael Echenberg, Care.com, Inc., Sheila Lirio Marcelo. Arguments. Court takes under advisement23 Motion to Dismiss. (Court Reporter: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Jacob Walker for the plaintiff. William Paine, Megan Barriger and Michael Bayer for the defendants.) (Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
Friday, January 17, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 01/17 5:24 PM
REPLY to Response to23 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint, filed by Care.com, Inc., Michael Echenberg, Sheila Lirio Marcelo. (Butts, John) |
|
Tuesday, December 17, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Opposition to Motion
Tue 12/17 10:28 AM
Opposition re23 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint, filed by Lesedi Toussaint. (Block, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, November 05, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice Setting or Resetting Hearing on Motion
Tue 11/05 11:59 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion23 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint, : Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
Friday, November 01, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Declaration
Fri 11/01 5:26 PM
DECLARATION re23 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint, by Care.com, Inc., Michael Echenberg, Sheila Lirio Marcelo.(Butts, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit N, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit O, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit P, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit Q, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit R, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit S, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit T, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit U, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit V | ||
24 | 24
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Fri 11/01 5:19 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re23 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint, filed by Care.com, Inc., Michael Echenberg, Sheila Lirio Marcelo. (Butts, John) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Dismiss
Fri 11/01 5:16 PM
MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint, by Care.com, Inc., Michael Echenberg, Sheila Lirio Marcelo.(Butts, John) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 11/01 11:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Megan E. Barriger on behalf of Care.com, Inc., Michael Echenberg, Sheila Lirio Marcelo (Barriger, Megan) |
|
Thursday, October 31, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Thu 10/31 11:45 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting20 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
Monday, October 28, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
motion
File Excess Pages
Mon 10/28 2:47 PM
Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Care.com, Inc., Michael Echenberg, Sheila Lirio Marcelo.(Butts, John) |
|
Monday, September 16, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 09/16 2:48 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Lesedi Toussaint.(Block, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Electronic Endorsement - non-order
Tue 07/23 10:46 AM
ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re17 Stipulation Regarding Scheduling Order filed by Lesedi Toussaint. APPROVED. Plaintiffs to file an amended complaint by 9/16/19. Defendants to file motion to dismiss or respond to the amended complaint by 11/1/19. Plaintiffs' opposition to the motion to dismiss to be filed by 12/17/19. Defendants' reply brief to be filed by 1/17/20. (Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation
Mon 07/22 1:10 PM
STIPULATION Regrading Scheduling Order by Lesedi Toussaint. (Walker, Jacob) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order
Wed 07/17 12:16 PM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Counsel to file proposed schedule for the filing of a consolidated complaint and a briefing schedule in the event that defendants respond to that complaint by filing a motion to dismiss by 7/31/19.(Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
15 | 15
3
pgs
order
Order
Wed 07/17 12:15 PM
Judge Denise J. Casper: Stipulation and Order Regarding Complaint and Responsive Pleading. (Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 07/17 12:12 PM
Judge Denise J. Casper: Order Appointing Lessedi Toussaint Lead Plaintiff and his Selection of Block & Leviton LLP as Lead Counsel.(Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Reassignment
Thu 07/11 10:12 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Denise J. Casper added. Pursuant to senior status Judge Mark L. Wolf no longer assigned to case. (Danieli, Chris) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/24 10:35 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Bayer on behalf of Care.com, Inc., Michael Echenberg, Sheila Lirio Marcelo (Bayer, Michael) |
|
Monday, June 03, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice - Other
Mon 06/03 10:25 PM
NOTICE by Lesedi Toussaint of Non-Opposition to Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and His Selection of Block & Leviton LLP as Lead Counsel(Block, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Press Release, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 26, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
4
pgs
misc
Stipulation
Fri 04/26 11:06 AM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Complaint and Responsive Pleading by Care.com, Inc., Michael Echenberg, Sheila Lirio Marcelo. (Butts, John) |
|
9 | 9
2
pgs
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/26 10:59 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Care.com, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate Alphabet Inc., Other Affiliate CapitalG LP for Care.com, Inc... (Butts, John) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/26 10:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew S. Dulberg on behalf of Care.com, Inc., Michael Echenberg, Sheila Lirio Marcelo (Dulberg, Andrew) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/26 10:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Butts on behalf of Care.com, Inc., Michael Echenberg, Sheila Lirio Marcelo (Butts, John) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/26 10:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Paine on behalf of Care.com, Inc., Michael Echenberg, Sheila Lirio Marcelo (Paine, William) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/03 3:51 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Wed 04/03 3:37 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/03 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob A. Walker on behalf of Lesedi Toussaint (Walker, Jacob) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Affidavit
Wed 04/03 2:43 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Lesedi Toussaint re1 Complaint, PSLRA Certification by Lesedi Toussaint. (Block, Jeffrey) |
|
1 | 1
13
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/03 2:33 PM
COMPLAINT against Care.com, Inc., Michael Echenberg, Sheila Lirio Marcelo Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7618761 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Lesedi Toussaint.(Block, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Category Form |