Terrell v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada et al
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Patrick J Schiltz |
Referred: | Hildy Bowbeer |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-00922 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2019 |
Terminated: | Oct 31, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 30, 2019 4:43 AM CDT |
Defendant
Union Security Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lee Terrell
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Terminated: 04/30/2019
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, October 31, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 10/31 7:18 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 10/31/2019. (CLG) |
|
Wednesday, October 30, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 10/30 9:14 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Union Security Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Plaintiff Lee Terrell and Defendant Union Security Insurance Company. (Anderson, Robyn) |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
minutes
Status Conference
Fri 08/30 10:09 AM
Minute Entry for telephone status conference held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/29/2019. Counsel updated the Court on the status of their settlement discussions. (JMK) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting)
Mon 08/26 2:38 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER TIME CHANGE ONLY: Due to a change in the Court's schedule, the time of telephone status conference, set for Thursday, August 29, 2019, is being changed. The conference will now begin at 4:00 p.m., by Conference Bridge. Instructions for calling into the Bridge will be e-mailed to the parties by chambers. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/26/2019. (JMK) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 07/03 8:47 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 8/29/2019 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Amended Pleadings due by 8/12/2019. Fact Discovery due by 7/12/2019. Motions (non-disp) due 8/12/2019. Motions (disp) due by 3/30/2020. Ready for trial due by 7/30/2020. See the order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/2/2019. (JMK) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Mon 07/01 2:52 PM
Minute Entry for Initial Pretrial Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/1/2019. A written Pretrial Scheduling Order will be issued. (JMK) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order in Response to Letter/Request/E-mail
Tue 06/25 9:53 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER: This case is set for a Rule 16 Conference on July 1, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. The parties have requested permission to appear by phone (Doc. No. 13). Counsel will be allowed to appear by phone and shall provide the names and telephone numbers of those who will participate by no later than 3:00 p.m. on Friday, June 28, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/25/2019. (JMK) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Letter to Magistrate Judge
Mon 06/24 2:59 PM
LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Union Security Insurance Company . (Anderson, Robyn) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Mon 06/24 12:08 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Union Security Insurance Company.(Anderson, Robyn) |
|
Friday, June 07, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 06/07 4:43 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robyn Lyn Anderson for Union Security Insurance Company. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/7/2019. (NAH) |
|
Thursday, June 06, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident)
Thu 06/06 3:15 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robyn L. Anderson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6922336 filed by Union Security Insurance Company. (Wagener, Terrance) |
|
Wednesday, June 05, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting)
Wed 06/05 4:16 PM
ORDER setting PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/24/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/5/2019.(JMK) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form | ||
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 05/29 3:30 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Union Security Insurance Company. (Wagener, Terrance) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Parties
Tue 04/30 10:40 AM
ORDER DISMISSING Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 4/30/2019. (CLG) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Stipulation
Mon 04/29 2:25 PM
STIPULATION for Voluntary Dismissal and Reformation of the Pleadings Pursuant to Rule 41 by Union Security Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Lee Terrell. (Wagener, Terrance) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 04/10 3:31 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Lee Terrell. All Defendants. (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/03 4:45 PM
TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/03 4:12 PM
Summons Issued as to Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, Union Security Insurance Company. (JLB) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Wed 04/03 4:11 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-922 (PJS/HB). (JLB) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/03 10:56 AM
COMPLAINT against Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, Union Security Insurance Company (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6780024) filed by Lee Terrell. Filer requests summons issued. (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |