Lherisson v. Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Roy K Altman |
Referred: | Lisette M Reid |
Case #: | 9:19-cv-80467 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 17, 2020 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 18, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order Withdrawing Reference/Case No Longer Referred
Wed 03/18 9:25 AM
PAPERLESS Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid/Case Closed by the District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 3/18/2020. (br) |
|
Tuesday, March 17, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
order
Judgment
Tue 03/17 1:53 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT,JUDGMENT in favor of Florida Attorney General, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections against Massillon Lherisson. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 3/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee) |
|
14 | 14
3
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Tue 03/17 1:50 PM
ORDER, adopted in full13 Report and Recommendations. Certificate of Appealability: Shall not issue. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 3/17/2020. See attached document for full details. Text Modified on 3/17/2020 (mee) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Report and Recommendations
Tue 02/25 11:35 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 28 USC 2254 case re1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Massillon Lherisson; Recommending that 1)the federal habeas petition be DISMISSED as time-barred; 2)a certificate of appealability be DENIED; and, 3)the case CLOSED. Objections to R&R due by 3/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 2/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (br) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Appendix
Mon 08/12 10:51 AM
APPENDIX to11 Response to Order to Show Cause by Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections(Melear, Melynda) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Appendix | ||
11 | 11
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Mon 08/12 10:48 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re9 Order to Show Cause, by Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections. (Melear, Melynda) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 08/06 10:10 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melynda Layne Melear on behalf of Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections. Attorney Melynda Layne Melear added to party Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections(pty:dft). (Melear, Melynda) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
4
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 08/02 11:07 AM
LIMITED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - 28 U.S.C. § 2254 REGARDING TIMELINESS OF FEDERAL PETITION. On or before AUGUST 31, 2019, the respondent shall file a response to this show cause order regarding its position on the timeliness of this federal petition. Show Cause Response due by 8/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/23 3:50 PM
NOTICE of filing state trial court docket to be made part of this federal proceeding. Clerk mailed a copy of all Exhibits to Plaintiff. (fbn) |
|
Att: 1 On-Line State Docket Case# 50-2010-CF-002071-BXXX-MB, | ||
Att: 2 Appellate Docket Case No. 4D16-1460 | ||
7 | 7
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Tue 04/23 3:46 PM
ORDER OF DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 4/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order Reassigning/Transferring Case
Thu 04/11 4:01 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Roy Altman for all further proceedings, Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (jmd) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order Requiring Payment of Filing Fee or Filing IFP Motion
Tue 04/09 3:20 PM
ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH DETAILED AFFIDAVIT. Filing Fee due by 5/9/2019. Motions due by 5/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 4/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn) |
|
Att: 1 IFP Form | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order of Instructions to Pro Se Litigant
Tue 04/09 3:14 PM
INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 4/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
9
pgs
misc
Memorandum
Thu 04/04 12:20 PM
MEMORANDUM of Law In Support re1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Massillon Lherisson. (jas) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Thu 04/04 12:17 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (jas) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Thu 04/04 12:16 PM
APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00, Not Paid/No IFP, filed by Massillon Lherisson. (jas) |