New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Brian M Cogan
Referred: Robert M Levy
Case #: 1:19-cv-01994
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2019
Terminated:Apr 26, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 09, 2019 4:34 AM EDT
Defendant
Dror Svorai
Defendant
CSX4236 Motorcycle Salvage, LLC
Defendant
Hudson Data Center, Inc.
Defendant
Michael Maranda
38 Oaklawn Avenue
Farmville, NY 11738
Defendant
Mining Power Group, Inc.
Defendant
Northway Mining, LLC
7014 13th Avenue Suite 202
Brooklyn, NY 11228
Plaintiff
9384-2557 Quebec Inc.
Represented By
Edward Williams
Peyrot & Associates, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
MinedMap, Inc.
a Nevada limited liability 3960 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 500
Las Vegas Nevada, NV 89169
Represented By
Edward Williams
Peyrot & Associates, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Serenity Alpha, LLC
Represented By
Edward Williams
Peyrot & Associates, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/23/2021 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 29, 2019
utility Transfer Case Opened Mon 04/29 8:05 AM
CASE: 1:19-cv-01994 DETAILS: Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in Northern District of New York - Main Office (Syracuse) [NextGen CM/ECF Release 1.2 Related [+]] as case 1:19-cv-00501, filed 04/26/2019. (Marziliano, August)
Related: [-] vision 1.2
Friday, April 26, 2019
transfer Case Transferred Out - District Transfer Fri 04/26 11:19 AM
Case transferred to District of Northern District of New York. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/25/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2019
13 13 3 pgs notice Notice(Other) Thu 04/25 4:07 PM
NOTICE by MinedMap, Inc. Notice of Emergency Motion for Change of Venue (Williams, Edward)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Thu 04/25 4:50 PM
ORDER granting13 emergency motion for change of venue (which should have been docketed as a "motion" on ECF, not a "notice"). Plaintiff brought this case in the wrong venue, perhaps not wrong as a technical matter, but in a venue that is useless to it because the assets on which it seeks a prejudgment Order of Seizure are in the Northern District of New York, not this district, and thus they cannot be seized by the U.S. Marshal for the Eastern District of New York. Under these unusual circumstances, and because plaintiff has produced some evidence showing that the assets may be rapidly wasting, the Court grants the motion to transfer to the NDNY as being in the interest of justice under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). The 7-day waiting period under the Local Rules is waived, but even with that, it may have been faster for plaintiff to take a voluntary dismissal of this action and simply recommence it in NDNY. However, since plaintiff opted to proceed in this manner, the Court grants the motion. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/25/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2019
order Order(Other) Wed 04/24 11:07 AM
ORDER. The Court's 4/22/2019 Order and the 4/23/2019 writ of replevin are VACATED because the Court does not have jurisdiction to send a marshal to seize property outside of the Eastern District of New York. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/24/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2019
11 11 2 pgs order Order for Warrant for Arrest of Property Mon 04/22 4:17 PM
ORDER for issuance of Writ of Replevin. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/22/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2019
10 10 5 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Fri 04/19 11:38 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re7 Notice(Other) filed by MinedMap, Inc.. (Williams, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Exhibit Exhibit C: Hosting Agreement,
Att: 2 2 pgs Affidavit in Support Exhibit D: Affidavit of Ryan Lehmann in Support of Emergency Motion for Replevin,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 18, 2019
9 9 misc Affidavit/Affirmation Thu 04/18 10:54 AM
AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION of Allen Song by MinedMap, Inc. (Williams, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Shipping Records,
Att: 2 42 pgs List of Bitcoin Machines with Serial Numbers
8 8 misc Letter Thu 04/18 2:46 AM
Letter to The Honorable I. Leo Glasser by MinedMap, Inc. (Williams, Edward)
Related: [-]
order Order Reassigning Case Thu 04/18 9:53 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis for all further proceedings. Judge I. Leo Glasser no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 4/18/2019. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
order Order Reassigning Case Thu 04/18 11:29 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan for all further proceedings. Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 4/18/2019. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2019
7 7 notice Notice(Other) Wed 04/17 5:59 PM
NOTICE by MinedMap, Inc. of Emergency Motion for Replevin (Williams, Edward)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2019
6 6 7 pgs service Summons Issued Mon 04/15 11:28 AM
Summons Issued as to CSX4236 Motorcycle Salvage, LLC, Dror Svorai, Hudson Data Center, Inc., Michael Maranda, Mining Power Group, Inc., Northway Mining, LLC. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 04/15 11:24 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 04/15 11:23 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 04/15 10:18 AM
Proposed Summons. by MinedMap, Inc. (Williams, Edward)
Related: [-]
2 2 25 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/15 9:43 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number BNYEDC-11383959 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by MinedMap, Inc.. (Williams, Edward)
Related: [-]
notice Notice(Other) Mon 04/15 8:36 AM
NOTICE : Plaintiff Counsel is directed to file the Complaint, Proposed Summon, a COMPLETED (2 Page Form) Civil Cover Sheet, and pay Civil Filing for the following case so that it may be processed (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/15 11:21 AM
Case Assigned to Judge I. Leo Glasser and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2019
1 1 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 04/12 3:22 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by MinedMap, Inc. (Williams, Edward)
Related: [-]