Classic Cloth, Inc
Member Case
Lead case is: 6:19-bk-10541
Lead case is: 6:19-bk-10541
Kansas Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Robert E Nugent |
Case #: | 6:19-bk-10552 |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 21, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Classic Cloth, Inc.
308 W Mill St
Plainville, KS 67663-2229 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee 301 North Main Suite 1150
Wichita, KS 67202 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Sunday, June 23, 2019 | ||
48 | 48
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 06/23 11:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 06/23/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, June 21, 2019 | ||
47 | 47
order
Final Decree
Fri 06/21 1:48 PM
Final Decree Signed on 6/21/2019 (wkh) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 06/21 1:49 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (wkh) |
||
Monday, June 03, 2019 | ||
46 | 46
trustee
United States Trustee Meeting Report (Concluded)
Mon 06/03 11:35 AM
United States Trustee Meeting Report: Meeting held and concluded. Statement of Inability to Appoint Creditors Committee due to inadequate responses from 20 Largest Creditors Filed by U.S. Trustee. (U.S. Trustee) |
|
Thursday, May 16, 2019 | ||
45 | 45
notice
Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H
Thu 05/16 3:56 PM
Notice of Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H Filed by Edward J. Nazar on behalf of Classic Cloth, Inc . (Nazar, Edward) |
|
44 | 44
misc
Amended Schedules
Thu 05/16 3:55 PM
Amended Schedules. Fee Amount $31 Filed by Debtor Classic Cloth, Inc. (Nazar, Edward) |
|
crditcrd
Thu 05/16 4:41 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Amended Schedules (Fee) 19-10552 [misc,amdsch] ( 31.00). Receipt number 15829791,amount $ 31.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Thursday, May 09, 2019 | ||
43 | 43
court
Courtroom Minute Sheet
Fri 05/10 12:44 PM
Courtroom Minute Sheet (REN), Ruling: See CMS for further details; continued for hearing to 5/22/19 @ 1:30pm as to these properties. Counsel will submit individual Orders on the remaining properties that they have come to resolutions on., Hearing Held (wdh) |
|
Sunday, May 05, 2019 | ||
42 | 42
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 05/05 11:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 05/05/2019. (Admin.) |
|
41 | 41
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 05/05 11:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 05/05/2019. (Admin.) |
|
40 | 40
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 05/05 11:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 05/05/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, May 02, 2019 | ||
39 | 39
order
Joint Administration
Fri 05/03 1:51 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration on Lead Case 6:19-bk-10541 with Member Case 6:2019-bk-10552-REN; 19-10542 19-10543 19-10544 19-10545 19-10546 19-10547 19-10548 19-10549 19-10550 and 19-10551 Signed on 5/2/2019. (wkh) |
|
38 | 38
5
pgs
order
Order on Generic Motion
Fri 05/03 1:48 PM
Order Granting Motion Signed on 5/2/2019. (wkh) |
|
37 | 37
order
Employ
Fri 05/03 1:40 PM
Order Granting Application to Employ Counsel Signed on 5/2/2019. (wkh) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 05/01 5:31 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Eric W Lomas with Certificate of Service Filed by Interested Party Chucko-Furn, LLC. (Lomas, Eric) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2019 | ||
court
Hearing Set(Motion)
Fri 04/26 10:05 AM
Hearing Set Hearing to be held on 5/9/2019 at 10:30 AM Wichita Room 150 for21 , (wdh) |
||
Thursday, April 25, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
answer
Objection
Thu 04/25 5:57 PM
Joint Objection to by Bank of Hays and FSSW, LLC Filed by Creditor Bank of Hays (Pollak, Creath) |
|
34 | 34
answer
Objection
Thu 04/25 12:07 PM
Joint Objection to by Bank of Hays and FSSW, LLC Filed by Creditor Bank of Hays (Pollak, Creath) |
|
court
Hearing Set(Motion)
Thu 04/25 3:26 PM
Hearing Set Hearing to be held on 5/9/2019 at 10:30 AM Wichita Room 150 for19 , (wdh) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 04/12 2:33 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Creath L. Pollak with Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Bank of Hays. (Pollak, Creath) |
|
32 | 32
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 04/12 10:48 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Classic Cloth, Inc. (Nazar, Edward) |
|
31 | 31
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 04/12 10:26 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Classic Cloth, Inc. (Nazar, Edward) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 04/12 10:14 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Classic Cloth, Inc. (Nazar, Edward) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 04/12 12:03 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 04/11/2019. (Admin.) |
|
28 | 28
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Fri 04/12 12:03 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Notice Date 04/11/2019. (Admin.) |
|
27 | 27
order
Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim
Thu 04/11 1:29 PM
Order Granting Motion To Set Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim Signed on 4/11/2019. Proofs of Claims due by 6/15/2019. (wkh) |
|
26 | 26
notice
Generic Notice
Thu 04/11 11:01 AM
Notice of Intended Abandonment of Inventory. Filed by Edward J. Nazar on behalf of Classic Cloth, Inc . (Nazar, Edward) |
|
25 | 25
notice
Generic Notice
Thu 04/11 10:52 AM
Notice of Requested Rejection of Executory Contracts. Filed by Edward J. Nazar on behalf of Classic Cloth, Inc . (Nazar, Edward) |
|
24 | 24
notice
Objection Deadline
Thu 04/11 8:51 AM
Notice of Objection Deadline. Proposed Hearing to be held 06/13/19 at 10:30 am. Certificate of Service on 04/11/19. Filed by Edward J. Nazar on behalf of Classic Cloth, Inc Objections due by 5/2/2019. (Nazar, Edward) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Limit Notice
Thu 04/11 8:33 AM
Motion to Limit Notice Under the Provisions of Rule 2002(m) Filed on behalf of Debtor Classic Cloth, Inc.(Nazar, Edward) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Objection Deadline
Wed 04/10 5:44 PM
Notice of Objection Deadline. Proposed Hearing to be held 05/09/19 at 10:30 am. Certificate of Service on 04/10/19. Filed by Edward J. Nazar on behalf of Classic Cloth, Inc Objections due by 4/25/2019. (Nazar, Edward) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Abandon
Wed 04/10 5:33 PM
Motion to Abandon Certain Consignment Property . Filed on behalf of Debtor Classic Cloth, Inc.(Nazar, Edward) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Objection Deadline
Wed 04/10 5:24 PM
Notice of Objection Deadline. Proposed Hearing to be held 05/09/19 at 10:30 am. Certificate of Service on 04/10/19. Filed by Edward J. Nazar on behalf of Classic Cloth, Inc Objections due by 4/25/2019. (Nazar, Edward) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Abandon
Wed 04/10 5:11 PM
Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract and , Motion to Abandon Certain Inventory Items . Filed on behalf of Debtor Classic Cloth, Inc.(Nazar, Edward) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim
Wed 04/10 4:52 PM
Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Filed on behalf of Debtor Classic Cloth, Inc.(Nazar, Edward) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 04/09 6:06 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Classic Cloth, Inc. (Nazar, Edward) |
|
16 | 16
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Tue 04/09 3:06 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/17/2019 at 10:00 AM at Wichita Room B-56.Objection to Section 523 Due: 7/16/2019. (wkh) |
|
15 | 15
order
Debtor-In-Possession To Pay Taxes
Tue 04/09 2:19 PM
Order to Debtor in Possession Respecting Report and Payment of Federal Taxes Signed on 4/9/2019 (waa) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Change of Address
Tue 04/09 12:28 PM
Change of Address Filed by Debtor Classic Cloth, Inc. (Nazar, Edward) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 04/09 12:01 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jordan M Sickman with Certificate of Service Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee. (Sickman, Jordan) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 04/09 11:31 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Christopher T. Borniger with Certificate of Service Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee. (Borniger, Christopher) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Support Document
Tue 04/09 10:17 AM
Document filed in support of : Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11, Credit Card) with Certificate of Service on. Filed by Debtor Classic Cloth, Inc . (Nazar, Edward) |
|
crditcrd
Tue 04/09 8:31 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11, Credit Card) 19-10552 [misc,volp11cc] (1717.00). Receipt number 15722868,amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Support Document
Mon 04/08 9:35 PM
Document filed in support of : Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11, Credit Card) with Certificate of Service on. Filed by Debtor Classic Cloth, Inc. . (Nazar, Edward) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Objection Deadline
Mon 04/08 9:26 PM
Notice of Objection Deadline. Proposed Hearing to be held 05/09/19 at 10:30 AM. Certificate of Service on 04/08/19. Filed by Edward J. Nazar on behalf of Classic Cloth, Inc. Objections due by 4/29/2019. (Nazar, Edward) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Joint Administration
Mon 04/08 9:17 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Lead Case 19-10541 and 19-10542 19-10543 19-10544 19-10545 19-10546 19-10547 19-10548 19-10549 19-10550 19-10551 19-10552 Filed on behalf of Debtor Classic Cloth, Inc..(Nazar, Edward) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Objection Deadline
Mon 04/08 9:06 PM
Notice of Objection Deadline. Proposed Hearing to be held 05/09/19 at 10:30 am. Certificate of Service on 04/08/19. Filed by Edward J. Nazar on behalf of Classic Cloth, Inc. Objections due by 4/29/2019. (Nazar, Edward) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Generic Motion
Mon 04/08 8:54 PM
Motion for Allowance of Monthly Fee Applications and Limited Notice of Fee Applications for Debtors' Counsel Filed on behalf of Debtor Classic Cloth, Inc..(Nazar, Edward) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Objection Deadline
Mon 04/08 8:43 PM
Notice of Objection Deadline. Proposed Hearing to be held 05/09/19 at 10:30 am. Certificate of Service on 04/08/19. Filed by Edward J. Nazar on behalf of Classic Cloth, Inc. Objections due by 4/29/2019. (Nazar, Edward) |
|
4 | 4
9
pgs
motion
Employ
Mon 04/08 8:32 PM
Application to Employ Hinkle Law Firm LLC as Attorneys for Debtors Filed on behalf of Debtor Classic Cloth, Inc..(Nazar, Edward) |
|
3 | 3
misc
DeBN Request Form
Mon 04/08 8:12 PM
DeBN Request Form: Initial Declination Request for the Debtor Filed by Debtor Classic Cloth, Inc.. (Nazar, Edward) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))
Mon 04/08 8:11 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by Debtor Classic Cloth, Inc. . (Nazar, Edward) |
|
1 | 1
150
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11, Credit Card)
Mon 04/08 8:09 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Classic Cloth, Inc. Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing due by 04/15/2019. (Nazar, Edward) |