Roor International BV et al v. King James Enterprises, Inc. et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Roy B Dalton, Jr |
Referred: | Embry J Kidd |
Case #: | 6:19-cv-00659 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 29, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 05, 2019 5:31 AM EDT |
Defendant
The Mojo Shop, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mitchell Watson
|
|
Plaintiff
Roor International BV
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sream, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
King James Enterprises, Inc.
Terminated: 07/12/2019
|
|
Defendant
Jack A. Barnes
Terminated: 07/12/2019
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, June 01, 2020 | ||
51 | 51
misc
Patent/Trademark Report
Mon 06/01 11:47 AM
Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (MAA) |
|
Att: 1 ORDER | ||
Friday, May 29, 2020 | ||
50 | 50
2
pgs
order
Order dismissing case
Fri 05/29 8:40 AM
ORDER dismissing case re 49 Notice of settlement. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/28/2020. (BIA) (ctp) |
|
Tuesday, May 26, 2020 | ||
49 | 49
notice
Notice of settlement
Tue 05/26 11:34 AM
NOTICE of settlement of Claims by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. (Sasson, Jamie) |